Global Patent Index - EP 1318014 A1

EP 1318014 A1 2003-06-11 - Device for fixing a running material web

Title (en)

Device for fixing a running material web

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Fixieren einer Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositf pour fixer une bande de materiau en mouvement

Publication

EP 1318014 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02025885 A

Priority

  • DE 10160391 A
  • DE 10204510 A

Abstract (en)

An arrangement for fixing a dielectric sheet material (4) which is to be printed, comprises a steel press (5) which presses the material onto a forming cylinder (1) plate (3). The steel press has a smooth, electrically conducting surface. The steel press is in the form of a corona charging electrode (8), for positive or negative electrostatic charges.

Abstract (de)

Es ist eine Vorrichtung zum Fixieren einer in Transportrichtung bewegten, zu bedruckenden Materialbahn (4) aus einem dielektrischen Werkstoff bekannt, wobei das auf einem Formatzylinder angeordnete Klischee (3) auf die Materialbahn und diese gegen einen Stahlpresseur eines Flexodruckwerks angedruckt wird. Hierbei weist der Stahlpresseur (5) eine glatte, elektrisch gut leitende Oberfläche auf und ist ihm eine als Korona-Aufladeelektrode (8) ausgebildete Einrichtung (7,8) zum positiven oder negativen elektrostatischen Aufladen zugeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 5/24; B65H 20/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 5/24 (2006.01); B65H 20/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/02 (2013.01); B41F 5/24 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5132 (2013.01); B65H 2515/70 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318014 A1 20030611; EP 1318014 B1 20050302; ES 2236427 T3 20050716

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091120

2011-09-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50202370

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50202370

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110310

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091119

2011-03-23 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110323

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091119

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091119

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081229

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081125

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081226

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2236427 T3

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50202370 P 20050407

2005-04-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040205

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030715

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI