Global Patent Index - EP 1318017 A2

EP 1318017 A2 2003-06-11 - Pulley for an embossing machine

Title (en)

Pulley for an embossing machine

Title (de)

Umlenkrolle für eine Prägemaschine

Title (fr)

Poulie pour une machine d'estampage

Publication

EP 1318017 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026567 A

Priority

DE 10159662 A

Abstract (en)

A roller-pin fixed to the machine has fixed to it by its axially apart end sections a porous air-permeable sleeve. The roller-pin has a compressed air duct directed at the pin's sleeve to form an air cushion between the sleeves. The two axially separated bearing end sections of the roller-pin fix the end sections of the pin's sleeve. The compressed air duct opens into a smaller-diameter middle section between the two bearing end sections. A peripheral flange on the roller-pin, next to the bearing section, adjoins one annular end surface of the pin's sleeve. The end side of the roller-pin axially apart from the flange, has a disc (42) fixed to it.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Umlenkrolle (10) für eine Prägemaschine beschrieben, die zum Umlenken einer Prägefolienbahn und/oder einer zu beprägenden Substratbahn vorgesehen ist. Um die Umlenkrolle (10) mit einer vernachlässigbar geringen Reibung auszubilden, ist an einem maschinenfesten Rollendorn (14) mindestens eine poröse luftdurchlässige Dornhülse (24) festgelegt, an der mindestens eine Rollenhülse (34) gelagert ist, wobei der maschinenfeste Rollendorn (14) einen Druckluftkanal (18) zur Beaufschlagung der/jeder Dornhülse( 24) mit Druckluft aufweist und die Druckluft zur Ausbildung eines Luftpolsters (50) zwischen der jeweiligen Dornhülse (24) und der zugehörigen Rollenhülse (34) vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 19/02; B41F 19/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/07 (2006.01); B65H 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 27/00 (2013.01); B31F 1/07 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0728 (2013.01); B31F 2201/073 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0753 (2013.01); B65H 2401/242 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1321 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318017 A2 20030611; EP 1318017 A3 20040922; EP 1318017 B1 20090923; DE 10159662 A1 20030626; DE 10159662 B4 20050811; DE 50213864 D1 20091105; US 2003114283 A1 20030619; US 7097604 B2 20060829

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171215

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-12-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100624

2009-11-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213864 P 20091105

2009-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-09-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-09-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KALUZA, GEORG

2009-09-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FRIEDMANN, RALF

2008-01-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEONHARD KURZ STIFTUNG & CO. KG

2007-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070608

2005-06-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041009

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-09-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41F 19/02 A

2004-09-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41F 19/06 B

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI