Global Patent Index - EP 1318021 A1

EP 1318021 A1 2003-06-11 - Method and apparatus for printing

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for printing

Title (de)

Druckverfahren und -Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d'impression

Publication

EP 1318021 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02079889 A

Priority

US 1605401 A

Abstract (en)

A printing apparatus is provided. The apparatus includes a pressurized source (102a or 102b or 102c) of a thermodynamically stable mixture of a fluid and a marking material. Portions of a printhead (103) define a delivery path (26), which is connected to the pressurized source. The printhead includes a discharge device (105) having an outlet with a portion of the discharge device being positioned along the delivery path. The discharge device is shaped to produce a shaped beam of the marking material. The fluid is in a gaseous state at a location beyond the outlet of the discharge device. An actuating mechanism (104) is positioned along the delivery path and has an open position at least partially removed from the delivery path. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/21

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B05B 15/04 (2006.01); B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 2/015 (2006.01); B41J 2/04 (2006.01); B41J 2/21 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/04 (2013.01); B41J 2/211 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318021 A1 20030611; JP 2003211654 A 20030729; US 2003107614 A1 20030612; US 2003210317 A1 20031113; US 6863368 B2 20050308

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051222

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI