Global Patent Index - EP 1318023 A2

EP 1318023 A2 2003-06-11 - Ink jet recording element and printing method

Title (en)

Ink jet recording element and printing method

Title (de)

Tintenstrahl-Aufzeichnungselement und Druckverfahren

Title (fr)

Elément pour l'enregistrement au jet d'encre et procédé d'impression

Publication

EP 1318023 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02079855 A

Priority

  • US 1168101 A
  • US 1165501 A

Abstract (en)

An ink jet recording element having a support having thereon an image-receiving layer of porous polymeric particles in a polymeric binder, the porous polymeric particles being prepared in the presence of an anionic or cationic dispersant, and the image-receiving layer containing a surfactant having a charge opposite to that of the dispersant used to make the porous polymeric particles, the surfactant being present in an amount from 0.04 parts to 0.30 parts by weight of the dispersant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/52 (2013.01); B41M 5/508 (2013.01); B41M 5/5227 (2013.01); B41M 5/5236 (2013.01); B41M 5/5254 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318023 A2 20030611; EP 1318023 A3 20041208; JP 2003205677 A 20030722

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051024

2005-08-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-06-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050422

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI