Global Patent Index - EP 1318075 A1

EP 1318075 A1 2003-06-11 - Method and apparatus for calibrating and conditioning fruit with short term preservation

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for calibrating and conditioning fruit with short term preservation

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Kalibrieren und Konditionieren von Früchten mit kurzzeitiger Konservierung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de calibrage et de conditionnement de fruits à faible temps de conservation

Publication

EP 1318075 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01390011 A

Priority

EP 01390011 A

Abstract (en)

The procedure consists of pre-grading the fruit by size, weight and quality on a conventional grading line (12), discharging it through outlets (13) according to grade, and packing in trays (16) with individual cells which are stacked and passed to a refrigeration chamber (28) with automated storage and control systems. After cooling, the trays of fruit are dispatched to a packaging post where the fruit is re-packed in suitable containers.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé de calibrage et de conditionnement de fruits à faible temps de conservation, dits fruits d'été, selon lequel on effectue un pré-calibrage dimensionnel de détermination du calibre, pondéral et qualitatif des fruits, on évacue les fruits pré-calibrés au niveau de sorties (13) dédiées chacune à un calibre donné, on transfère de façon automatisée, au niveau de chaque sortie (13), les fruits dans des plateaux (16) dotés d'alvéoles (17,18) ménagées selon un rangement organisé, aptes à loger chacune un fruit de façon individualisée, on empile les plateaux alvéolés, on transporte les piles de plateaux (16) dans une chambre frigorifique (28) dotée de moyens automatisés (32) de prise en charge, de stockage desdites piles et de déstockage et de sortie de ces piles, et des moyens de gestion de ladite chambre frigorifique aptes à identifier et mémoriser l'emplacement et le contenu de chaque pile de plateaux, et, lors de chaque commande de conditionnement, on ressort de la chambre frigorifique (28) le nombre de piles de plateaux (16) nécessaires à la réalisation de cette commande, on désempile lesdits plateaux, et on convoie ces derniers vers au moins un poste de conditionnement (43) dans lesquels les fruits sont transférés dans les conditionnements adéquats. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 25/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES GR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318075 A1 20030611; EP 1318075 B1 20060719; ES 2269319 T3 20070401

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180109

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171027

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-08-30 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20060403608

- Effective date: 20130703

2011-03-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070420

2007-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2269319 T3

2006-11-23 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060403608

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT

2004-04-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT

2004-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031107

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI