Global Patent Index - EP 1318079 A1

EP 1318079 A1 2003-06-11 - Closure assembly with captive cap

Title (en)

Closure assembly with captive cap

Title (de)

Verschlussvorrichtung mit unverlierbarem Verschluss

Title (fr)

Ensemble de bouchage àcapuchom imperdable

Publication

EP 1318079 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02356250 A

Priority

FR 0115725 A

Abstract (en)

The plugging assembly (10) comprises a cap (11) which is placed on an end piece (4), a retention ring (12) which is locked behind a retention projection (6) on the end piece and a flexible link (13) which connects the cap to the ring. The link extends between the cap and the retention ring and is shaped so as to hold the cap and retention ring coaxially to each other. There is a breakable assembling zone (25) of the link to the cap and to the retention ring.

Abstract (fr)

1 - Ensemble de bouchage à capuchon imperdable, comprenant un capuchon (11) propre à être mis en place sur un embout (4), un anneau de rétention (12), destiné à être verrouillé derrière une saillie de rétention (6) que comprend cet embout (4), et un lien souple (13) reliant le capuchon (11) à l'anneau. Selon l'invention, le lien (13) s'étend selon un parcours hélicoïdal, au moment de la mise en place de l'ensemble de bouchage (10) sur l'objet (1) à équiper, entre le capuchon (11) et l'anneau de rétention (12) et est conformé de manière à maintenir ce capuchon (11) et cet anneau de rétention (12) coaxialement l'un à l'autre, ce lien (13) permettant ainsi, lorsque, au cours de ladite mise en place, l'anneau de rétention (12) vient porter contre la saillie de rétention (6) et que l'engagement du capuchon (11) sur l'embout (4) est poursuivi, d'appuyer contre l'anneau de rétention (12) afin de réaliser le passage de ce dernier au-delà de la saillie de rétention (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 55/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 55/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 55/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318079 A1 20030611; FR 2832984 A1 20030606; FR 2832984 B1 20040130

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061018

2006-08-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOBEM

2006-08-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MERMET, BERNARD

2004-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030916

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI