Global Patent Index - EP 1318091 A2

EP 1318091 A2 2003-06-11 - Method for winding a material web and winding machine to perform the method

Title (en)

Method for winding a material web and winding machine to perform the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Aufwickeln einer laufenden Materialbahn sowie Wickelmaschine zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Méthode pour bobiner une bande de matériau et bobineuse pour mettre en oeuvre cette méthode

Publication

EP 1318091 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02025424 A

Priority

DE 10159360 A

Abstract (en)

The moving web of material (2) is wound consecutively, especially drums onto several winder cores (3). A fresh winder core (3.2) is started when a wound roll (4) formed on a previous old core (3.1) reaches a pre-set diameter (D). The new core is guided directly onto a winder roller (5) especially drum, over whose outer periphery (5.1) the web of material runs onto the winder-core. A separator (8) directly after the nip, especially lance (8.1) detaches the material, by means of a high-powreed air jet (9), from the winder-core. A blower (10) especially blow-tube (10.2) directed against the outer periphery of the new core transfers the at least one starter-web (7) by means of a jet onto the outer periphery of the new core.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Aufwickeln einer laufenden Materialbahn (2), insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn. Die Erfindung ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass nach dem Durchlaufen der Materialbahn (2) durch den von der Wickelwalze (5) und dem neuen Wickelkern (3.2) gebildeten Nip (N) mindestens ein im Bahnrand (2.1) der Materialbahn (2) liegender Bahnanfang (7) mittels mindestens eines von mindestens einer Trenneinrichtung (8), insbesondere einer Luftlanze (8.1), kurzzeitig erzeugten Hochenergie-Luftstrahls (9) durch Ablösung der Materialbahn (2) von der Außenumfangsfläche (5.1) der Wickelwalze (5) und gleichzeitiger Durchtrennung derselben gebildet wird und dass anschließend der mindestens eine nunmehr gebildete Bahnanfang (7) mittels mindestens eines von einer ersten, gegen die Außenumfangsfläche (3.21) des neuen Wickelkerns (3.2) gerichteten Blaseinrichtung (10), insbesondere eines Blasrohrs (10.2), kurzzeitig erzeugten Blasstrahls (11) auf die Außenumfangsfläche (3.21) des neuen Wickelkerns (3.2) überführt und vorzugsweise angelegt wird. Die Erfindung betrifft weiterhin eine Wickelmaschine (1) zur Durchführung des erfindungsgemäßen Verfahrens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/26 (2006.01); B65H 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/2261 (2013.01); B65H 19/265 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41425 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5151 (2013.01); B65H 2301/51533 (2013.01); B65H 2301/51534 (2013.01); B65H 2301/51536 (2013.01); B65H 2408/2364 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318091 A2 20030611; EP 1318091 A3 20041110; EP 1318091 B1 20061018; AT 342860 T 20061115; DE 10159360 A1 20030612; DE 50208489 D1 20061130

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091115

2010-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091115

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081115

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081114

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20081114

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071122

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070719

2007-01-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070118

2006-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50208489 P 20061130

2006-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2005-07-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE

2005-07-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050510

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI