Global Patent Index - EP 1318092 A2

EP 1318092 A2 2003-06-11 - Method and device for the splicing of material webs

Title (en)

Method and device for the splicing of material webs

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verbinden von Materialbahnen

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour le raccordement de bandes de matériau

Publication

EP 1318092 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026781 A

Priority

DE 10159529 A

Abstract (en)

The run-off (13) and fresh (15) webs of material are drawn off by a run-off (14) and new (16) bobbin (14) respectively positioned on a support-pin (10.11) each, and conveyed to a splice unit (19). The run-off and fresh webs are deflected by rollers (23,24). Double-sided adhesive tape is supplied to the run-off web and pressed onto the side of the run-off web facing the fresh web. The run-off web is cut through by a knife at a position following the tape.

Abstract (de)

Zur Verbindung von Materialbahnen aus Verpackungsmaterial, nämlich einer Ablaufbahn (13) mit einer Neubahn (15) wird ein doppelseitig klebendes Tape (22) im Bereich einer Splice-Einheit (19) der Ablaufbahn (13) zugeführt. Diese erfasst mittels Tape (22) die bereitgehaltene Neubahn (15) und zieht diese bei Aufrechterhaltung der Fördergeschwindigkeit mit. Die Ablaufbahn (13) wird danach durchtrennt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/1831 (2013.01); B65H 2301/46152 (2013.01); B65H 2301/46174 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4621 (2013.01); B65H 2301/46312 (2013.01); B65H 2403/514 (2013.01); B65H 2555/24 (2013.01); B65H 2801/81 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318092 A2 20030611; EP 1318092 A3 20041110; EP 1318092 B1 20080709; DE 10159529 A1 20030626; DE 50212468 D1 20080821

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-06-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090414

2008-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50212468 P 20080821

2008-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2008-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2005-05-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050317

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2004-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI