Global Patent Index - EP 1318099 A1

EP 1318099 A1 2003-06-11 - Industrial truck with dynamic control for drive

Title (en)

Industrial truck with dynamic control for drive

Title (de)

Flurförderzeug mit einer Dynamikregelung für einen Fahrantrieb und/oder einen Arbeitsantrieb

Title (fr)

Chariot de manutention avec contrôle dynamique pour entraînement

Publication

EP 1318099 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02026699 A

Priority

DE 10159409 A

Abstract (en)

A number of sensors are connected to a control device, to measure parameters relevant to the dynamics of the moving drive and/or working drive of the work machine. Based on the detected parameters, fuzzy logic is used to switch automatically between the programs of the movement drive and/or the programs of the working drive. The movement and/or working programs are stored in the form of characteristics.

Abstract (de)

Eine mobile Arbeitsmaschine, insbesondere Flurförderzeug, verfügt über einen Fahrantrieb und/oder einen Arbeitsantrieb. Das Beschleunigungs- und/oder das Bremsverhalten des Fahrantriebs und/oder des Arbeitsantriebs ist mittels eines oder einer Mehrzahl von Programmen einstellbar, die in einer in Wirkverbindung mit dem Fahrantrieb und/oder dem Arbeitsantrieb stehenden Steuereinrichtung gespeichert sind. Um die Beeinflussung der Dynamik zu vereinfachen, ist erfindungsgemäß an die Steuereinrichtung eine Mehrzahl von Gebern zur Messung von für die Dynamik des Fahrantriebs und/oder des Arbeitsantriebs der Arbeitsmaschine relevanten Parametern angeschlossen und wird in Abhängigkeit von den erfassten Messgrößen automatisch zwischen den Programmen des Fahrantriebs und/oder zwischen den Programmen des Arbeitsantriebs umgeschaltet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318099 A1 20030611; EP 1318099 B1 20060308; DE 10159409 A1 20030612; DE 50206008 D1 20060504

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50206008

- Representative's name: PATENTSHIP PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2017-01-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50206008

- Representative's name: PATENTSHIP PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50206008

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091129

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081125

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061211

2006-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-04 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060308

2006-06-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206008 P 20060504

2006-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2006-03-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060308

2006-03-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060308

2005-06-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: INDUSTRIAL TRUCK WITH DYNAMIC CONTROL FOR DRIVE

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040330

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031107

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI