Global Patent Index - EP 1318205 A1

EP 1318205 A1 2003-06-11 - THIN STEEL SHEET AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (en)

THIN STEEL SHEET AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (de)

DÜNNES STAHLBLECH UND ENTSPRECHENDES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

FEUILLE EN ACIER MINCE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1318205 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01941087 A

Priority

  • JP 0105209 W
  • JP 2000183870 A
  • JP 2000183871 A
  • JP 2000195437 A
  • JP 2000195438 A
  • JP 2000198652 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002148536A1] The steel sheet comprises: a ferritic phase having ferritic grains of 10 or more grain size number and ferritic grain boundaries; and at least one kind of Nb precipitates and Ti precipitates. The ferritic grain has a low density region with a low precipitate density in the vicinity of grain boundary. The low density region has a precipitate density of 60% or less to the precipitate density at center part of the ferritic grain. The steel sheet consists essentially of 0.002 to 0.02% C, 1% or less Si, 3% or less Mn, 0.1% or less P, 0.02% or less S, 0.01 to o.1% sol.Al, 0.007% or less N, at least one element of 0.01 mass %, and the balance being Fe.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/14; C21D 8/04; C21D 9/46; C21D 9/48; C22C 38/04; C22C 38/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/04 (2006.01); C21D 9/48 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/02 (2006.01); C22C 38/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/06 (2006.01); C22C 38/12 (2006.01); C22C 38/14 (2006.01); C21D 8/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/14 (2013.01); C22C 38/002 (2013.01); C22C 38/004 (2013.01); C22C 38/02 (2013.01); C22C 38/04 (2013.01); C22C 38/06 (2013.01); C22C 38/12 (2013.01); C21D 8/0226 (2013.01); C21D 8/0236 (2013.01); C21D 8/0273 (2013.01); C21D 8/0278 (2013.01); C21D 2211/004 (2013.01); C21D 2211/005 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12799 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 2002148536 A1 20021017; US 6743306 B2 20040601; CN 1190513 C 20050223; CN 1286999 C 20061129; CN 1383459 A 20021204; CN 1560310 A 20050105; EP 1318205 A1 20030611; EP 1318205 A4 20050803; EP 2312009 A1 20110420; EP 2312010 A1 20110420; US 2004168753 A1 20040902; US 7252722 B2 20070807; WO 0198552 A1 20011227

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151119

2011-01-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091229

2005-08-03 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050617

2005-04-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 38/14 A

2005-04-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 21D 9/46 B

2005-04-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 38/04 B

2005-04-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 38/12 B

2005-04-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 21D 8/04 B

2005-04-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 21D 9/48 B

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

2004-02-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JFE STEEL CORPORATION

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020311

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI