Global Patent Index - EP 1318218 A1

EP 1318218 A1 2003-06-11 - Saw-toothed wire

Title (en)

Saw-toothed wire

Title (de)

Sägezahndraht

Title (fr)

Fil à dent de scie

Publication

EP 1318218 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 03000810 A

Priority

EP 99122418 A

Abstract (en)

Saw tooth wire comprises a foot section (20) and a blade section (30) connected to a collar. The blade section has teeth (32) formed by tooth recesses (34). The ratio of the foot width to the blade width at the point of the deepest tooth recess is more than 2, preferably more than 2.5, especially approximately 2.6. <??>Preferred Features: The ratio of the foot width to the blade width at the point of the deepest tooth recess is less than 3.5, preferably less than 3. The wire is made from alloyed steel containing (in wt.%) 0.3-2.0 C, 0.1-2.5 Si, 0.1-2.0 Mn, 0.1-2.0 Mn, 0.1-2.0 V, 0.1-2.0 Cr and/or 0.6-0.7 W.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Sägezahndraht zur Herstellung einer Sägezahn-Ganzstahlgarnitur für den Tambour einer Karde mit einem Fußabschnitt und einem über eine Fußschulter daran anschließenden Blattabschnitt, wobei der Blattabschnitt durch von dem den Fußabschnitt abgewandten Rand des Blattabschnittes ausgehende Zahneinschnitte gebildete Sägezähne aufweist, bei dem das Verhältnis der Fußbreite zur Blattbreite an der Stelle des tiefsten Zahneinschnittes größer als 2, vorzugsweise größer als 2,5, besonders bevorzugt etwa 2,6 ist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 15/88

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27B 33/16 (2006.01); B23D 61/12 (2006.01); B23D 61/18 (2006.01); D01G 15/88 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/88 (2013.01); Y10T 83/9319 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099783 A1 20010516; EP 1099783 B1 20030730; AT 246272 T 20030815; AT 291652 T 20050415; BR 0005315 A 20010612; CA 2325508 A1 20010510; DE 29924404 U1 20030206; DE 59906445 D1 20030904; DE 59911815 D1 20050428; EP 1318218 A1 20030611; EP 1318218 B1 20050323; ES 2200455 T3 20040301; ES 2236626 T3 20050716; JP 2001162440 A 20010619; MX PA00011036 A 20030425; TR 200003334 A2 20010621; TR 200003334 A3 20010621; TW 522183 B 20030301; US 2003116006 A1 20030626

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091111

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110323

2011-07-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59911815

- Representative's name: LEINWEBER & ZIMMERMANN, DE

2011-07-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59911815

- Representative's name: CANZLER & BERGMEIER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-07-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59911815

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE CANZLER & BERGMEIER PARTNERSCHA, DE

2011-04-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110405

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081110

2009-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081110

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081205

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20071224

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050623

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GRAF + CIE A.G.

- Effective date: 20051130

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GRAF + CIE AG

- Free text: GRAF + CIE AG# #8640 RAPPERSWIL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- GRAF + CIE AG# #8640 RAPPERSWIL (CH)

2006-03-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051227

2006-02-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-11-10 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-10-19 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-09-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-08-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050711

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2236626 T3

2005-06-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-05-18 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050401412

2005-04-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911815 P 20050428

2005-04-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-03-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1099783 P

2005-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-03-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-03-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-03-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050323

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030114

2003-06-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1099783 P

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE