Global Patent Index - EP 1318219 A2

EP 1318219 A2 2003-06-11 - Method and apparatus for spinning stable textile fibres using Spinnrotors

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for spinning stable textile fibres using Spinnrotors

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verspinnen textiler Stapelfasern mittels eines Spinnrotors

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la filature des fibres par un rotor de filage

Publication

EP 1318219 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02025456 A

Priority

DE 10160067 A

Abstract (en)

In a spinning process fibre runs at high-speed through a rotor housing maintained at low pressure and closed by a cap. The incoming staple fibres collect within the rotor groove, combine and twist in the binding-in-zone, and discharge as a yarn section (44) extending between the rotor groove and thread withdrawal jet. The yarn section is subject esp. to a pneumatic force (F) opposite to its direction of rotation (U). <??>The curved yarn section (44) is exposed to numerous surrounding array of tangential incoming air jets applying a twist force at an angle of between 10 and 30 to the yarn section (44). The yarn section (44) rotates at a distance of 0.5 to 1.5 mm from the surrounding air jets. Also claimed is a commensurate open-end spinning assembly.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren beziehungsweise eine Vorrichtung zum Verspinnen textiler Stapelfasern mittels eines Spinnrotors, der mit hoher Drehzahl in einem unterdruckbeaufschlagbaren, durch eine Faserkanalplatte verschließbaren Rotorgehäuse umläuft, wobei die in den Spinnrotor eingespeisten Stapelfasern in einer Rotorrille gesammelt, in einer Einbindezone zu einem Garn zusammengedreht und anschließend unter Bildung eines Garnschenkels, der sich zwischen der Rotorrille und einer Fadenabzugsdüse erstreckt, abgezogen werden. Erfindungsgemäß ist vorgesehen, daß auf den Garnschenkel (44) eine pneumatische Kraft (F) gegeben wird, die den Garnschenkel (44) entgegen seiner Umlaufrichtung (U) auswölbt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/08 (2006.01); D01H 4/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318219 A2 20030611; EP 1318219 A3 20030813; CN 1422998 A 20030611; CZ 20023685 A3 20030917; DE 10160067 A1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040214

2004-06-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI