Global Patent Index - EP 1318220 A1

EP 1318220 A1 2003-06-11 - Weaving reed and lamella

Title (en)

Weaving reed and lamella

Title (de)

Webblatt und Lamelle

Title (fr)

Peigne de tissage et lamelle

Publication

EP 1318220 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02028178 A

Priority

  • BE 9800446 A
  • BE 9800648 A
  • BE 9800649 A
  • EP 99927931 A

Abstract (en)

The reed (20) for a high speed loom has a number of adjacent blades (21) in a row, held by an upper profile (8) and the lower reed profile (22) secured to the sley beam (12). The blades (21) have a section extending from the lower profile (22) in a width of about 6 mm and the width of the upper blade section is about 4 mm. <??>The blades (21) have a U-shaped recess, to form a weft guide channel (5) in the center section. The bottom section of the blades (21) have a rectangular shape within the lower profile (22), with a width of about 6 mm, and the upper blade sections have a rectangular shape with a width of about 4 mm within the upper profile (8). The leading edges (32,13) of the lower (14) and upper (16) sections of the blade (21) form a beat-up edge (31) at the recess. The blade (21) has a straight edge between the upper (8) and lower (22) profiles, at the side away from the weft guide channel (5). The bottom of the blade can be in a wedge shape, to match the wedge shape of the lower profile. The tapering wedge has a reducing width from the open side of the profile over a length which is one-third to one-half of the profile depth, leading into a rectangular shape with a reduced width. The length of the rectangular section is about equal to the length of the tapering wedge shape.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Webblatt (60) mit einer Vielzahl von in einer Reihe nebeneinander angeordneten Lamellen (61), deren Enden in einem unteren Profil (62) und in einem obere Profil (8) gehalten sind, wird vorgesehen, daß die Lamellen wenigstens in einem aus dem unteren Profil herausragenden Abschnitt eine Breite von etwa 6 mm und in einem oberen Abschnitt eine Breite von etwa 4 mm aufweisen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 49/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 49/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/278 (2013.01); D03D 49/62 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964654 A1 19991216; DE 59907557 D1 20031204; DE 59910957 D1 20041202; DE 59914449 D1 20070920; EP 1086267 A1 20010328; EP 1086267 B1 20031029; EP 1318220 A1 20030611; EP 1318220 B1 20041027; EP 1500732 A2 20050126; EP 1500732 A3 20050511; EP 1500732 B1 20070808; JP 2002517633 A 20020618; JP 4553486 B2 20100929; US 6401762 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160609

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170103

2017-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59910957

2016-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150617

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-10-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PICANOL, BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PICANOL N.V., IEPER, BE

- Document: DE 59910957

- Effective date: 20120814

2012-10-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59910957

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE RUFF, WILHELM, BEIER, DAUSTER &, DE

- Effective date: 20120814

2012-08-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59910957

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE RUFF, WILHELM, BEIER, DAUSTER &, DE

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100609

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100609

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090623

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PICANOL N.V.

- Free text: PICANOL N.V.#TER WAARDE 50#8900 IEPER (BE) -TRANSFER TO- PICANOL N.V.#TER WAARDE 50#8900 IEPER (BE)

2005-10-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050728

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050105

2004-12-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910957 P 20041202

2004-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2004-10-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1086267 P

2004-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-10-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PICANOL N.V.

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1086267 P

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI