Global Patent Index - EP 1318224 A2

EP 1318224 A2 2003-06-11 - Raising machine

Title (en)

Raising machine

Title (de)

Rauhmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à gratter

Publication

EP 1318224 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02017350 A

Priority

DE 10160164 A

Abstract (en)

A textile web napping mill has a pair of drums (16) each with napping rollers (5, 6). Each array of napping rollers (5, 6) is esp. rotated by a discrete drive system. <??>The napping assembly has a machine frame with two essentially cylindrical drums, each having a planetary array of napping rollers acting in mutual opposition. One set of rollers (6) is driven by a ribbed V-belt while the second set of rollers (5) is driven by a V-belt. Alternatively one set of napping rollers (6) is driven by a toothed belt, while the second set of napping rollers is driven by a V-belt. The belts are speed-regulated endless belts.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Rauhmaschine zum Rauhen einer textilen Warenbahn. Die bekannten Rauhmaschinen weisen für die Strichwalzen und für die Gegenstrichwalzen jeweils gleiche Antriebssysteme auf. Hierdurch ist die Leistungsfähigkeit der Maschinen begrenzt. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es daher, die Leistungsfähigkeit von Rauhmaschinen bei mindestens gleichbleibender Rauhqualität zu erhöhen. Dies wird dadurch erreicht, dass für die Gegenstrichwalzen (6,23) und für die Strichwalzen (5,22) unterschiedliche Antriebssysteme angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06C 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318224 A2 20030611; EP 1318224 A3 20050518; DE 10160164 A1 20030626; DE 10160164 B4 20070405

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-06-04 [D18W] WITHDRAWAL (DELETED)

2008-04-16 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080310

2006-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060627

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060627

2006-02-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI TR

2006-01-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051118

2005-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-05-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-01-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI