Global Patent Index - EP 1318229 A1

EP 1318229 A1 2003-06-11 - Method for controlling sorting systems and sorting system for using the method

Title (en)

Method for controlling sorting systems and sorting system for using the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Regelung von Sortiersystemen sowie zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens geeignetes Sortiersystem

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la régulation de systèmes de triage et système de triage pour l'application du procédé

Publication

EP 1318229 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02024605 A

Priority

DE 10160603 A

Abstract (en)

To control the multi-stage sorting of fiber suspensions, to be used as pulp for papermaking, each stage sorts the fiber suspension into at least a fine and a coarse fraction. Part of the coarse fraction is taken for further sorting and the derived fine fraction is returned to the sorting process. The mass flows are established at the inflow and outflow of each stage by on-line measurement and/or computation. The registered values are passed to a processor, for mathematic modeling and condition control of the sorting system. The mass flows at the sorting stages and/or selected machine parameters are adjusted according to target values relating to production, efficiency, fiber loss and the like.

Abstract (de)

Es werden ein Verfahren zur Regelung von insbesondere mehrstufigen Sortiersystemen bei der Papiererzeugung sowie ein nach dem Verfahren arbeitendes Sortiersystem beschrieben, bei dem die jeweils einer Sortierstufe zugeführte Faserstoffsuspension (S) in mindestens eine Feinfraktion (F) und eine Grobfraktion (G) aufgeteilt und zumindest ein Anteil einer Grobfraktion (G) nochmals sortiert und wenigstens die dabei enthaltene Feinfraktion in den Sortiervorgang rückgeführt wird, wobei an jeder Sortierstufe (1,9,15) des Sortiersystems die ein- ausgangsseitigen Massenströme durch online-Messung und/oder Berechnung erfasst und die gewonnenen Werte einem dem Sortiersystem zugeordneten Prozessor (10) zur mathemati schen Modellierung und Zustandsregelung des Sortiersystems zugeführt werden und dabei in Abhängigkeit von vorgebbaren Zielgrößen wie Produktion, Wirkungsgrad, Faserverlust und dergleichen die ausgangsseitigen Massenströme und/oder auswählbare Maschinenparameter des Sortiersystems beeinflusst werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21D 5/02; D21G 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B03B 5/00 (2006.01); D21D 5/02 (2006.01); D21G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 9/0018 (2013.01); D21D 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318229 A1 20030611; EP 1318229 B1 20070404; AT 358742 T 20070415; CA 2413486 A1 20030610; DE 10160603 A1 20030626; DE 50209858 D1 20070516; EP 1767690 A2 20070328; EP 1767690 A3 20071024; JP 2003239186 A 20030827; US 2003116661 A1 20030626; US 7083049 B2 20060801

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-09-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50209858

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131104

2014-08-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131104

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131105

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 358742 T

- Effective date: 20131104

2014-07-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080107

2007-09-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209858 P 20070516

2007-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR SE

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2004-04-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031007

2004-03-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR SE

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI