Global Patent Index - EP 1318230 A1

EP 1318230 A1 2003-06-11 - Headbox

Title (en)

Headbox

Title (de)

Stoffauflauf

Title (fr)

Caisse de tête

Publication

EP 1318230 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02024712 A

Priority

DE 10159412 A

Abstract (en)

The stock inlet (12) for a papermaking machine, and especially a multi-layer stock inlet, has an outflow jet (10) with at least one blade (16) dividing its interior zone (14). The blade is hollow, to pump (20) a dosed medium (18) into the fiber suspension, and especially under a pressure which differs from the pressure around the blade. The hollow blade is mounted at the turbulence block (24) of the stock inlet. The pumped medium can be recovered water from the web drying stages, glue, starch, fine or bulking matter, auxiliary materials, dye, and the like.

Abstract (de)

Ein Stoffauflauf (12), insbesondere Mehrschichtstoffauflauf, einer Papiermaschine, umfasst eine Düse (10), deren Innenraum (14) zumindest bereichsweise durch wenigstens eine Lamelle unterteilt ist, wobei zumindest eine Lamelle (16) als Hohllamelle ausgeführt ist, die vorzugsweise zur Dosierung eines pumpfähiges Mediums (18) in die Suspension insbesondere auch mit einem vom Druck im die Hohllamelle umgebenden Bereich des Düsenraumes verschiedenen Druck beaufschlagbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/028 (2013.01); D21F 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318230 A1 20030611; EP 1318230 B1 20061115; AT 345417 T 20061215; DE 10159412 A1 20030612; DE 50208694 D1 20061228

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161106

2017-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161106

2017-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 345417 T

- Effective date: 20161106

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20151111

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-09-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50208694

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131106

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131107

2014-07-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121127

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070817

2007-02-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50208694 P 20061228

2006-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031211

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI