Global Patent Index - EP 1318231 A1

EP 1318231 A1 2003-06-11 - Apparatus for dewatering a fibrous web

Title (en)

Apparatus for dewatering a fibrous web

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Entwässerung einer Faserstoffbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la déshydratation d'une bande fibreuse

Publication

EP 1318231 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02016713 A

Priority

DE 10159411 A

Abstract (en)

The dewatering device (10) has four rolls (14) arranged radially to limit the pressure chambers. Sealing units (32) are arranged to axially limit the pressure chambers. Adjustment devices are arranged to partially, individually and axially adjust the positions of the rolls and sealing units. Pressure gas is introduced into and a fibrous material web is guided through the pressure chambers. <??>An Independent claim is included for the fibrous material web dewatering process.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Vorrichtung (10) zur Entwässerung einer Faserstoffbahn, insbesondere Papier- oder Kartonbahn, beschrieben, bei der die Entwässerung durch Austreiben von Wasser mittels Gasdruck erfolgt. Die Vorrichtung umfasst zumindest einen radial durch wenigstens vier parallel angeordnete Walzen (14) und axial durch Abdichtungseinheiten (16) begrenzten Druckraum, in den ein Druckgas einleitbar und durch den die Faserstoffbahn hindurchführbar ist. Die Walzen (14) und die Abdichtungseinheiten (16) sind zumindest teilweise individuell axial verstellbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/04; D21F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/0263 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318231 A1 20030611; EP 1318231 B1 20061011; AT 342400 T 20061115; DE 10159411 A1 20030612; DE 50208399 D1 20061123; US 2003101614 A1 20030605; US 6708423 B2 20040323

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080727

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080726

2009-05-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080726

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080726

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070721

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070712

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070716

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-11-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070713

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070712

2007-07-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070719

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50208399 P 20061123

2006-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031211

2004-01-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI