Global Patent Index - EP 1318233 A2

EP 1318233 A2 2003-06-11 - Process and apparatus for treating a fibrous web

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for treating a fibrous web

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Behandeln einer Faserstoffbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le traitement d' une bande fibreuse

Publication

EP 1318233 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02024217 A

Priority

DE 10157689 A

Abstract (en)

Assembly heats the web in a wide roller nip formed by a roller and a rotating mantle or two supported mantles. The roller/mantle are in contact with the web between them over a given peripheral section. Before the web enters the wide nip, it is treated with a fluid to moisten the fibers and the fiber structure. The fluid is applied to the web at a faster speed than the web on entering the nip. <??>Assembly (1) heats the web in a wide roller nip (9) formed by a roller (3) and a rotating mantle (5) or two supported mantles. The roller/mantle are in contact with the web between them over a given peripheral section. Before the web enters the wide nip, it is treated with a fluid to moisten the fibers and the fiber structure. The fluid is applied to the web at a faster speed than the web on entering the nip. <??>The molecular structure of the liquid is unchanged on passing through the nip, and it evaporates within the nip with a higher vapor pressure than steam from the water contained in the web. The liquid contains one or more components of liquid nitrogen, alcohol, ester, water with a reduced surface tension, and water at a higher temperature than the web in front of the nip.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung (1) zum Behandeln einer Faserstoffbahn (2), insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn, angegeben, bei dem man die Bahn (2) in einem Breitnip (9) erwärmt, der durch eine Walze (3) und einen umlaufenden Mantel (5) oder durch zwei über Stützelemente laufende Mäntel gebildet ist, die über einen vorbestimmten Umfangsabschnitt in Kontakt stehen. Man möchte die Glättergebnisse der Behandlung verbessern und mehr Feuchtigkeit in der Bahn behalten. Hierzu beaufschlagt man die Bahn (2) vor dem Breitnip (9) mit einem Medium, das sich schneller als das sich beim Eintreten in den Breitnip in den Fasern und im Fasergerüst befindende Faserwasser verdampfen läßt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/006 (2013.01); D21G 1/0093 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 10157689 C1 20030213; DE 50207845 D1 20060928; EP 1318233 A2 20030611; EP 1318233 A3 20030910; EP 1318233 B1 20060816

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-29 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20111027

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091101

2010-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-06-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20081015

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-06-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: V.I.B SYSTEMS GMBH

- Effective date: 20070510

2006-12-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207845 P 20060928

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2006-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2004-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2003-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030809

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-09-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI