Global Patent Index - EP 1318237 A2

EP 1318237 A2 2003-06-11 - Process and calender for satin-finishing a paper or cardboard web

Title (en)

Process and calender for satin-finishing a paper or cardboard web

Title (de)

Verfahren und Kalander zum Satinieren einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé et calandre pour le satinage d' une bande de papier ou carton

Publication

EP 1318237 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026040 A

Priority

DE 10158910 A

Abstract (en)

The calender assembly, to satinize the surface of a paper or cardboard web, has a number of nips (9-14) for the web to pass through between the calender rollers. The pressure applied at least in the first nip is restricted to apply a compression on the web in the plastic/elastic range. The specific pressure increases on the web progressively through the nips. The calender roller stack is formed of hard rollers (3,5,7) and soft rollers (2,4,6,8) with roller mantle claddings (15-18) with an increasing hardness from nip to nip, with a mantle hardness of Shore D 80-90 at the first nip. An adjustment mechanism (20) sets the nip pressures.

Abstract (de)

Es werden ein Verfahren und ein Kalander zum Satinieren einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn angegeben, bei dem die Bahn durch mehrere Nips (9-14) eines Walzenstapels geführt und in den Nips (9-14) mit Druck beaufschlagt wird. Man möchte eine möglichst gleichmäßige Verdichtung der Bahn in den Nips (9-14) erreichen. Hierzu wird die Druckbelastung zumindest im ersten Nip (9) auf einen Wert begrenzt, bei dem die Verdichtung der Bahn im plastisch-elastischen Bereich erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/006 (2013.01); D21G 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318237 A2 20030611; EP 1318237 A3 20050202; EP 1318237 B1 20060802; DE 10158910 A1 20030618; DE 10158910 B4 20051222; DE 50207705 D1 20060914

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-19 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20090319

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071123

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071122

2008-07-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ANDRITZ KUESTERS GMBH

- Effective date: 20070428

2007-06-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ANDRITZ KUESTERS GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20070428

2006-11-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061124

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-11-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-11-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20061114

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-11-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061114

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207705 P 20060914

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2006-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2005-10-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2005-03-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050113

2005-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI