Global Patent Index - EP 1318240 A2

EP 1318240 A2 2003-06-11 - Textile mesh for reinforcing bituminous layers

Title (en)

Textile mesh for reinforcing bituminous layers

Title (de)

Textiles Gitter zum Bewehren bitumengebundener Schichten

Title (fr)

Grille textile pour renforcer des couches bitumineuses

Publication

EP 1318240 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 03005795 A

Priority

  • DE 19652584 A
  • EP 01121592 A
  • EP 97954723 A

Abstract (en)

A textile lattice with wide meshing is for use to reinforce bitumen-bound layers, road coverings in particular. Intersecting threads (1,2) consisting of glass fibre or man-made fibres are applied on a thin nonwoven (3) by Raschel knitting. The connecting Raschel threads (5) encase the longitudinally running threads (1) of the lattice and fix the transverse threads (2). The nonwoven (3) consists of polyethylene terephthalate, polyethylene or polypropylene fibres, yarns and/or filaments.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein weitmaschiges textiles Gitter zum Bewehren bitumengebundener Schichten, insbesondere Straßendecken, das mit einem bitumenaffinen Haftmittel überzogen ist und im wesentlichen aus zwei Sätzen paralleler lastaufnehmender Fäden (1,2) besteht, wobei sich ein Satz der Fäden (1) in Längsrichtung des Gitters und der andere Satz der Fäden (2) quer zur Längsrichtung des Gitters erstreckt und die Fäden (1,2) aus Glasfasern oder Chemiefasern wie Polymerisatfasern oder Polykondensatfasern bestehen. Um ein Armierungsgitter für bitumengebundene Schichten zu entwickeln, das keine störende Trennschicht zwischen den Schichten bildet, sind die Maschen des Gitters durch ein dünnes Vlies (3) ausgefüllt, das so dünn und nachgiebig ist, daß das Vlies (3) nicht als Trennschicht zwischen der unter dem Gitter und der über dem Gitter befindlichen Asphaltschicht wirkt und eine gute Verzahnung der groben Körner des auf das Gitter aufgebrachten Asphalt-Mischguts mit den groben Körnern des unter dem Gitter befindlichen Mischguts ermöglicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 11/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 11/16 (2006.01); E04C 5/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 11/165 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24033 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24273 (2013.01); Y10T 442/10 (2015.04); Y10T 442/133 (2015.04); Y10T 442/159 (2015.04); Y10T 442/172 (2015.04); Y10T 442/181 (2015.04); Y10T 442/183 (2015.04); Y10T 442/184 (2015.04); Y10T 442/191 (2015.04); Y10T 442/197 (2015.04); Y10T 442/198 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19652584 A1 19980618; AT 214765 T 20020415; AT 247193 T 20030815; AU 5983698 A 19980715; AU 724371 B2 20000921; CA 2274798 A1 19980625; CA 2274798 C 20051101; CZ 296530 B6 20060412; CZ 9901828 A3 19991117; EP 0956392 A1 19991117; EP 0956392 B1 20020320; EP 0956392 B2 20051207; EP 1158098 A1 20011128; EP 1158098 B1 20030813; EP 1158098 B2 20091028; EP 1158098 B9 20100519; EP 1158098 B9 20110119; EP 1318240 A2 20030611; EP 1318240 A3 20030813; ES 2172832 T3 20021001; ES 2172832 T5 20060516; ES 2204794 T3 20040501; ES 2204794 T5 20091207; JP 2001506330 A 20010515; JP 3452939 B2 20031006; MY 119614 A 20050630; NO 315571 B1 20030922; NO 992840 A 19990708; NO 992840 D0 19990611; PL 191788 B1 20060731; PL 333948 A1 20000131; RU 2166019 C2 20010427; TW 483961 B 20020421; US 2003017771 A1 20030123; US 6503853 B1 20030107; US 6780798 B2 20040824; WO 9827282 A1 19980625

INPADOC legal status


2014-12-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140701

2007-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2004-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040213

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KASSNER, JUERGEN

2003-06-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1158098 P

2003-06-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0956392 P

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE