Global Patent Index - EP 1318257 A2

EP 1318257 A2 2003-06-11 - Device for an anti-panic lock

Title (en)

Device for an anti-panic lock

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für ein Antipanikschloss

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour une serrure antipanique

Publication

EP 1318257 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 02293015 A

Priority

ES 200102726 A

Abstract (en)

The anti-panic lock, designed to be released by pressure on a horizontal bar (1), consists of a plate (4) fixed to a U-section support (3), a vertically moving slider (5), and a rotating mouth (6) on an arm (2). The plate (4) is mounted vertically and clipped in place between the sides (3b) of the support (3) by means of projections (4a) on the plate engaging with holes (3c), the plate itself having two circular holes (7, 8). The slider moves between the plate and the sides and base of the support, and comprises a sole plate (5a), sides (5b) and a horizontal wall (5c). The sole plate has a vertical slideway (9) for a journal (11) that retracts the lock bolt.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif pour une serrure antipanique, qui comprend une plaque verticale (4) fixée au support en "U" (3), un coulisseau (5) qui coulisse verticalement et une bouche rotative (6) solidaire du bras (2) du support en "U" (3) ; dans lequel : la plaque (4) est montée verticalement, par encliquetage élastique, entre les flancs (3b) du support en "U" (3) et, sur ses bords verticaux, elle est munie de paires de protubérances (4a) qui sont complémentaires de logements (3c) présents dans lesdits flancs (3b) du support en U (3) ; ladite plaque (4) présente un trou (7) et un orifice (8) circulaires ; le coulisseau (5) est monté avec ajustement à glissement entre la plaque (4), les flancs (3b) et le fond (3a) du support en "U" (3), étant constitué par une semelle (5a), par deux côtés (5b), respectivement adossés au fond (3a), au flanc (3b) du support en "U" (3), et par une paroi horizontale (5) qui s'étend entre les extrémités inférieures desdits côtés (5b) ; la semelle (5a) présente une coulisse verticale (9) qui commence à son bord opposé à la paroi horizontale (5c) par un élargissement en arc de cercle (10) qui est complémentaire d'un tourillon à carré (11). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/10 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/1066 (2013.01); E05B 63/0056 (2013.01); E05B 63/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318257 A2 20030611; EP 1318257 A3 20041222; ES 2217910 A1 20041101; ES 2217910 B1 20050601

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070411

2005-10-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-09-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2005-06-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050411

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO