Global Patent Index - EP 1318258 A2

EP 1318258 A2 2003-06-11 - Fitting on a wing or a frame of a window, a door or similar

Title (en)

Fitting on a wing or a frame of a window, a door or similar

Title (de)

Beschlag an einem Flügel oder einem festen Rahmen eines Fensters, einer Tür oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Ferrure d'un vantail ou d'un dormant d'une fenêtre, d'une porte ou similaire

Publication

EP 1318258 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02023932 A

Priority

DE 10157826 A

Abstract (en)

The lock fitting for the swing frame of a door or window has at least one moving rod (16), which slides within a rabbet groove (4) at the frame when operated by the handle. It moves along the base (48) of the groove in the groove opening (49). The rod is linked to the handle by a coupling (14) at a side of the rod, to move along the groove length. The rod has a width within the groove which is, at maximum, equal to the width of the groove opening. The coupling has at least one side projection (27) from the rod which grips in front of and behind a projection (52) at the swing pane or the frame, on the same alignment. To give the back grip action, the coupling is moved laterally across the base of the groove, to lock the side projection to the panel or frame to prevent any lifting across the groove base.

Abstract (de)

Ein Beschlag an einem Flügel oder einem festen Rahmen eines Fensters, einer Tür oder dergleichen umfasst wenigstens ein Treibstangenelement (16), das mittels einer Betätigungseinrichtung in einer mit einem Nutgrund (48) und einer diesem gegenüberliegen Nutöffnung (49) versehenen Falznut (4) an dem Flügel oder dem festen Rahmen in Nutlängsrichtung bewegbar ist. Eine Antriebsverbindung des Treibstangenelementes (16) und der Betätigungseinrichtung ist über ein Kupplungsteil (14) hergestellt, das an der von dem Nutgrund (48) abliegenden Seite des Treibstangenelementes (16) angeordnet und mit diesem in Nutlängsrichtung bewegbar ist. Im Interesse einer möglichst einfachen Beschlagteilmontage weist das Treibstangenelement (16) in der Falznut (4) eine Breite auf, die maximal der Weite der Nutöffnung (49) entspricht. Außerdem steht das Kupplungsteil (14) in Einbaulage mit wenigstens einem seitlichen Überstand (27) gegenüber dem Treibstangenelement (16) vor und hintergreift einen gleichgerichteten Vorsprung (52) an dem Flügel oder dem festen Rahmen. Zur Herstellung des Hintergriffs ist das Kupplungsteil (14) unter Bewegung quer zu dem Nutgrund (48) an dem seitlichen Überstand (27) mit dem Flügel oder dem festen Rahmen verrastbar. Infolge des Hintergriffs ist das Kupplungsteil (14) gegen Abheben von dem Flügel oder dem festen Rahmen quer zu dem Nutgrund (48) gehalten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/10; E05B 3/00; E05C 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/20 (2006.01); E05C 9/22 (2006.01); E05B 3/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/20 (2013.01); E05C 9/006 (2013.01); E05B 3/00 (2013.01); E05C 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19506106 C2 19961219 - ROTO FRANK AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318258 A2 20030611; EP 1318258 A3 20060208; EP 1318258 B1 20070523; AT 363013 T 20070615; DE 10157826 A1 20030612; DE 50210194 D1 20070705

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171031

2018-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171031

2018-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171031

2018-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171031

2018-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180629

2018-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-10-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROTO FRANK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROTO FRANK AG, 70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 50210194

2015-09-24 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50210194

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121025

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121025

2013-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 363013 T

- Effective date: 20121025

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101028

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101007

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080226

2007-11-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210194 P 20070705

2007-06-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2007-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI

2006-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI

2006-07-12 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20060509

2006-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060411

2006-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2006-02-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI