Global Patent Index - EP 1318259 A2

EP 1318259 A2 2003-06-11 - Lock with auxiliary bolt

Title (en)

Lock with auxiliary bolt

Title (de)

Zusatzriegelschloss

Title (fr)

Serrure à pêne auxiliaire

Publication

EP 1318259 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02023163 A

Priority

DE 20119950 U

Abstract (en)

The auxiliary bolt lock is designed, so that a switch (30) is provided in or at the bolt housing (12). The switch (30) is coupled with the connecting rod (16) or the auxiliary bolt (14) or with an element working in conjunction with the auxiliary bolt. The auxiliary bolt (14) is a drop latch, a square latch, a bolt or a catch.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Zusatzriegelschloss (10) mit einem Riegelgehäuse (12) und einem aus dem Riegelgehäuse (12) vorschließbaren Zusatzriegel (14), welcher über eine Treibstange (16) von einem Hauptschloss antreibbar ist, wobei im oder am Riegelgehäuse (12) ein Schalter (30) vorgesehen ist und der Schalter (30) mit der Treibstange (16) oder dem Zusatzriegel (14) oder einem mit dem Zusatzriegel (14) zusammenwirkenden Element gekoppelt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/18; E05B 17/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05B 45/06 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 55/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/1841 (2013.01); E05B 45/06 (2013.01); E05B 55/00 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0069 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20119950 U1 20020404; EP 1318259 A2 20030611; EP 1318259 A3 20070214

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-04-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070815

2007-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2007-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI