Global Patent Index - EP 1318273 A2

EP 1318273 A2 2003-06-11 - Turbine blade, manufacturing method of turbine blade, and strip judging method of a thermal barrier coat

Title (en)

Turbine blade, manufacturing method of turbine blade, and strip judging method of a thermal barrier coat

Title (de)

Turbinenschaufel, Herstellungsverfahren einer Turbinenschaufel, sowie Beurteilungsverfahren für das Ablösen einer Wärmedämmschicht

Title (fr)

Aube de turbine, procédé de fabrication d'une aube de turbine, et procédé d'évaluation du détachement d'une couche de protection thermique

Publication

EP 1318273 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02012119 A

Priority

JP 2001374542 A

Abstract (en)

There is disclosed a turbine blade comprising a turbine blade main body 10 with a blade-shaped section and a thermal barrier coat 20 as an insulating layer. The turbine blade main body 10 includes an internal air gap 12 disposed inside so that a coolant gas passes and a plurality of coolant gas ports 13 connected to the internal air gap and disposed in the outer peripheral surface. The thermal barrier coat 20 is coated with the outer peripheral surface of the turbine blade main body. The thermal barrier coat fills in at least some of the coolant gas ports. Thereby, a temperature of a high-temperature gas is raised and the turbine blade can be run. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/18; C23C 4/00; F01D 5/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/00 (2006.01); C23C 4/02 (2006.01); C23C 28/00 (2006.01); F01D 5/18 (2006.01); F01D 5/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 28/3215 (2013.01); C23C 4/00 (2013.01); C23C 4/02 (2013.01); C23C 28/00 (2013.01); C23C 28/321 (2013.01); C23C 28/345 (2013.01); C23C 28/3455 (2013.01); F01D 5/182 (2013.01); F01D 5/288 (2013.01); F05D 2230/90 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318273 A2 20030611; EP 1318273 A3 20041229; EP 1318273 B1 20061129; CA 2385932 A1 20030607; CA 2385932 C 20070717; DE 60216405 D1 20070111; DE 60216405 T2 20070329; JP 2003172102 A 20030620; US 2003108424 A1 20030612

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-29 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20160222

2016-06-29 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20160222

2016-02-22 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 60216405

2016-02-22 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 60216405

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150508

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-05-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-07-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG ABTEILUNG CT IP PG

- Effective date: 20070606

2007-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070312

2007-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60216405 P 20070111

2006-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-11-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061129

2006-06-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TURBINE BLADE, MANUFACTURING METHOD OF TURBINE BLADE, AND STRIP JUDGING METHOD OF A THERMAL BARRIER COAT

2005-09-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI