Global Patent Index - EP 1318274 A1

EP 1318274 A1 2003-06-11 - High-pressure turbine blade with cooled trailing edge

Title (en)

High-pressure turbine blade with cooled trailing edge

Title (de)

Hochdruck-Turbinenschaufel mit gekühlter Abströmkante

Title (fr)

Aube de turbine haute-pression ayant un bord de fuite refroidi

Publication

EP 1318274 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02292970 A

Priority

FR 0115904 A

Abstract (en)

The mobile high-pressure turbine blade has a cooling circuit with at least one cavity extending radially between the tip of the blade and its foot and a series of slots (26) originating in the cavity and extending towards the blade's trailing edge perpendicular to its lengthwise axis. Of the slots at least the one (28) closest to the blade's foot is inclined towards its tip at an angle of between 10 and 30 degrees, and preferably 20 degrees, to the blade's axis of rotation.

Abstract (fr)

Aube mobile de turbine haute-pression de turbomachine, comprenant au moins un circuit de refroidissement composé d'au moins une cavité s'étendant radialement entre un sommet et un pied de l'aube, d'au moins une ouverture d'admission d'air à une extrémité radiale de la ou les cavités pour alimenter le ou les circuits de refroidissement en air de refroidissement, et d'une pluralité de fentes (26) s'ouvrant dans la ou les cavités et débouchant sur le bord de fuite de l'aube, les fentes étant aménagées le long du bord de fuite, entre le pied et le sommet de l'aube, de façon sensiblement perpendiculaire à un axe longitudinal de l'aube, au moins la fente (28) la plus proche du pied de l'aube présentant une inclinaison vers le sommet de l'aube comprise entre 10° et 30° par rapport à un axe de rotation de l'aube. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/187 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318274 A1 20030611; EP 1318274 B1 20040922; CA 2412989 A1 20030605; CA 2412989 C 20080923; DE 60201325 D1 20041028; DE 60201325 T2 20050317; ES 2225740 T3 20050316; FR 2833298 A1 20030613; FR 2833298 B1 20040806; JP 2003193804 A 20030709; JP 4012054 B2 20071121; RU 2297537 C2 20070420; UA 80246 C2 20070910; US 2003108425 A1 20030612; US 6830431 B2 20041214

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES

- Effective date: 20170719

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-12-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131204

2015-04-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150407

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121205

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-02-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2225740 T3

2004-11-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60201325 P 20041028

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021207

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO