Global Patent Index - EP 1318281 A2

EP 1318281 A2 2003-06-11 - Active silencer for exhaust systems

Title (en)

Active silencer for exhaust systems

Title (de)

Aktiver Schalldämpfer für Abgasanlagen

Title (fr)

Silencieux actif pour système d'échappement

Publication

EP 1318281 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02018051 A

Priority

DE 10159487 A

Abstract (en)

The sound damping device (1) has a hollow body (4) with at least one movable wall (6), operated by a drive (10), for generation of counter sound, acoustically coupled to the engine exhaust pipe (9). The movable wall is provided by the bottom of a piston (5), the hollow body providing a cylinder space within which the piston is reciprocated at a constant ratio to the engine revs.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen aktiven Schalldämpfer (1) zum Dämpfen von Luftschall, den eine Maschine (3) mit einer rotierenden Antriebswelle (11) in Abhängigkeit ihrer Drehzahl erzeugt. Der Schalldämpfer (1) weist einen Hohlkörper (4) auf, der eine bewegliche Wand (7) zur Erzeugung von Gegenschall enthält und über eine Verbindung (8) mit einer zur Führung des zu dämpfenden Luftschalls geeigneten Leitung (9) akustisch gekoppelt ist. Der Schalldämpfer (1) besitzt außerdem eine Antriebseinrichtung (10) zum Bewegeri der beweglichen Wand (7). Einen besonders robusten Aufbau erhält der Schalldämpfer (1) dadurch, daß die bewegliche Wand durch einen Boden (7) eines Kolbens (5) gebildet ist, wobei der Hohlkörper durch einen Zylinderraum (4) gebildet ist, in dem der Kolben (5) hubverstellbar angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/065 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 10159487 C1 20030220; DE 50204073 D1 20051006; EP 1318281 A2 20030611; EP 1318281 A3 20040107; EP 1318281 B1 20050831

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180824

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180827

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-08-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170830

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170824

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170824

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-08-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2006-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-10-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051005

2005-10-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50204073 P 20051006

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2005-08-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2004-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040830

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI