Global Patent Index - EP 1318282 A1

EP 1318282 A1 2003-06-11 - Exhaust gas purification device

Title (en)

Exhaust gas purification device

Title (de)

Abgasreinigungsanlage

Title (fr)

Système de purification de gaz d'échappement

Publication

EP 1318282 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02026795 A

Priority

JP 2001374828 A

Abstract (en)

An exhaust gas purification device (12) having a NOx absorbent (12) includes a by-pass passage (18) for by-passing the NOx absorbent, exhaust gas flow rate control means (22) for regulating both a flow rate of exhaust gas flowing to the NOx absorbent and a flow rate of exhaust gas by-passing the NOx absorbent, and reductant addition means (32) for adding reductant into an exhaust passage upstream of the NOx absorbent. In this device, when it is necessary to discharge sulfur components from the NOx absorbent, a temperature rise control is executed such that a temperature of the NOx absorbent is higher than a predetermined temperature. Then, a rich condition control is executed such that an air-fuel ratio of the exhaust gas flowing to the NOx absorbent becomes one of a substantially stoichiometric condition and a rich condition. The flow rate of the exhaust gas to the NOx absorbent during the temperature rise control is controlled so as to be higher than that during the rich condition control. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/08; B01D 53/94; F02D 41/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/94 (2006.01); F01N 3/02 (2006.01); F01N 3/08 (2006.01); F01N 3/20 (2006.01); F01N 3/24 (2006.01); F01N 3/28 (2006.01); F01N 3/36 (2006.01); F01N 13/08 (2010.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 43/00 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F01N 3/023 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/028 (2013.01); B01D 53/9431 (2013.01); B01D 53/9495 (2013.01); F01N 3/0233 (2013.01); F01N 3/0842 (2013.01); F01N 3/085 (2013.01); F01N 3/0878 (2013.01); F01N 3/0885 (2013.01); F01N 13/0097 (2014.06); F01N 13/011 (2014.06); F01N 2570/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] FR 2796984 A1 20010202 - RENAULT [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318282 A1 20030611; EP 1318282 B1 20041117; DE 60201960 D1 20041223; DE 60201960 T2 20050331; JP 2003176715 A 20030627; JP 3757856 B2 20060322; US 2003106306 A1 20030612; US 6823664 B2 20041130

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171129

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171113

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-11-28 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 60201960

- Effective date: 20130919

2005-11-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-08-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60201960 P 20041223

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021202

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO