Global Patent Index - EP 1318287 A2

EP 1318287 A2 2003-06-11 - Diesel engine performance control method and engine equipped with a corresponding control unit

Title (en)

Diesel engine performance control method and engine equipped with a corresponding control unit

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Steuerung der Leistung eines Dieselmotors und Motor ausgerüstet mit einem entsprechendem Steuergerät

Title (fr)

Procédé de réglage des performances d'un moteur diesel et moteur équipé d'une unité de commande correspondante

Publication

EP 1318287 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 02292955 A

Priority

FR 0115718 A

Abstract (en)

The supplementary rate of fuel injection is limited (delta'qc, delta'qf) as a function of the reliability of the engine. The limit of the injection rate is calculated by means of a card (41,42) as a function of the speed of the engine. <??>The method includes determining the amount of a fuel injection value (qo), determining a limit of fuel injection as a function of a functioning criteria of the engine (qoc,qof), and, when the state of the transitional acceleration speed is detected, one determines a supplementary rate of fuel injection temporarily permitted beyond the limit (deltaqc, deltaqf).

Abstract (fr)

On se préoccupe d'améliorer la réponse d'un moteur diesel aux régimes transitoires d'accélération en accroissant la quantité d'injection de carburant momentanément au-delà des limites autorisées pour le couple moteur et la protection de fumées (36, 37 : qoc, qof). Des débits supplémentaires d'injection de carburant (41, 42 : Δqc, Δqf) sont calculés et ajoutés (45, 46) aux limites normales. Toutefois, ces débits supplémentaires sont modérés par des facteurs (Kfi, Ke, Kfr) tenant compte de paramètres de fiabilité du fonctionnement, qui peuvent être des températures, pressions, etc. et aussi des durées de régimes transitoires et de fréquence de ces régimes. Les facteurs modérateurs permettent d'envisager des débits supplémentaires plus importants en sachant qu'ils seront réduits automatiquement aux approches de fonctionnements extrêmes du moteur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/10; F02D 41/04; F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/10 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/38 (2013.01); F02D 41/045 (2013.01); F02D 41/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318287 A2 20030611; EP 1318287 A3 20050119; FR 2833041 A1 20030606; FR 2833041 B1 20040625

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090430

2005-10-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CRUCHET, JEROEME

2005-10-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FONTVIEILLE, LAURENT

2005-10-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LOMBARDIN, JACQUES-OLIVIER

2005-10-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SANTANGELI, VINCENT

2005-10-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2005-08-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI