Global Patent Index - EP 1318293 A2

EP 1318293 A2 2003-06-11 - Fuel injection system for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Fuel injection system for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Système d'injection de carburant pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1318293 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02023348 A

Priority

DE 10160258 A

Abstract (en)

The fuel injection device has a fuel injection valve (12) and a high pressure fuel pump (10) with first and second pistons (18,60). The first pump piston comes into contact with the second pump piston after an initial delivery stroke so that the second piston likewise performs a delivery stroke and bounds a working chamber (66) connected to a control pressure chamber.

Abstract (de)

Die Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung weist für jeden Zylinder der Brennkraftmaschine eine Kraftstoffhochdruckpumpe (10) und ein mit dieser verbundenes Kraftstoffeinspritzventil (12) auf. Ein erster Pumpenkolben (18) der Kraftstoffhochdruckpumpe (10) begrenzt einen Pumpenarbeitsraum (22), der mit einem Druckraum (40) des Kraftstoffeinspritzventils (12) verbunden ist, das ein Einspritzventilglied (28) aufweist, durch das Einspritzöffnungen (32) gesteuert werden und von dem im Druckraum (40) herrschenden Druck gegen eine Schließkraft in einer Öffnungsrichtung (29) bewegbar ist. Die Kraftstoffhochdruckpumpe (10) weist einen zweiten Pumpenkolben (60) auf, der einen Arbeitsraum (66) begrenzt und an dem nach einem Anfangsförderhub (a) der erste Pumpenkolben (18) zur Anlage kommt, so daß der zweite Pumpenkolben (60) ebenfalls einen Förderhub ausführt. Durch ein erstes Steuerventil (78) wird eine Verbindung (66) des Pumpenarbeitsraums (22) mit einem Entlastungsraum (24) gesteuert und durch ein zweites Steuerventil (82) wird eine Verbindung (80) eines mit dem Arbeitsraum (66) verbundenen, durch einen zumindest mittelbar in Schließrichtung auf das Einspritzventilglied (28) wirkenden Steuerkolben (50) begrenzten Steuerdruckraums (52) mit einem Entlastungsraum (24) gesteuert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 57/02; F02M 45/02; F02M 45/06; F02M 45/08; F02M 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/02 (2006.01); F02M 45/04 (2006.01); F02M 45/06 (2006.01); F02M 57/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/36 (2006.01); F02M 61/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/04 (2013.01); F02M 45/02 (2013.01); F02M 45/06 (2013.01); F02M 57/02 (2013.01); F02M 59/366 (2013.01); F02M 61/205 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0987431 A2 20000322 - LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318293 A2 20030611; EP 1318293 A3 20060322; EP 1318293 B1 20070829; DE 10160258 A1 20030618; DE 50210802 D1 20071011; US 2003106948 A1 20030612; US 6688541 B2 20040210

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081222

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080530

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071129

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070829

2008-04-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-03-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070829

2007-10-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210802 P 20071011

2007-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2007-08-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2006-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060922

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2006-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI