Global Patent Index - EP 1318294 A1

EP 1318294 A1 2003-06-11 - Injector, especially for common rail injection systems of diesel engines

Title (en)

Injector, especially for common rail injection systems of diesel engines

Title (de)

Injektor, insbesondere für Common-Rail-Einspritzsysteme von Dieselmotoren

Title (fr)

Injecteur, spécialement pour systèmes d'injection à rampe commune de moteurs Diesel

Publication

EP 1318294 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02023349 A

Priority

DE 10160262 A

Abstract (en)

A control piston (14) has a conical shape on the upper side (16) facing the discharge-throttle (11) or intake throttle (18). The throttles that cooperate with the control piston may have a conical form with a different cone angle. The cone angle of the discharge throttle (alpha Gegenstuck) is preferably larger than the cone angle (alpha Steuerkolben) of the control piston.

Abstract (de)

Ein Injektor, insbesondere für Common-Rail-Einspritzsysteme von Dieselmotoren, besitzt eine Düsennadel, einen Steuerkolben (14) zur Betätigung der Düsennadel, einen den Steuerkolben (14) betätigenden, durch einen Aktor (insbesondere Magnetventil oder Piezoelement) über eine Ablauf-Drossel (sog. A-Drossel 11) und eine Zulauf-Drossel (sog. Z-Drossel 18) angesteuertes Ventil und einen hydraulischen Anschlag (16) für den Steuerkolben (14), derart, dass der Durchfluss von der Z-Drossel (18) zur A-Drossel (11) am engsten Querschnitt (sog. E-Drossel 17) zusätzlich drosselbar ist. Eine wesentliche Besonderheit besteht darin, dass der Steuerkolben (14) an seiner der A-Drossel (11) bzw. der Z-Drossel zugewandten, abgesetzten Oberseite (16) konisch ausgebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/16; F02M 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 2200/28 (2013.01); F02M 2200/30 (2013.01); F02M 2200/304 (2013.01); F02M 2547/003 (2013.01); F02M 2547/008 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318294 A1 20030611; EP 1318294 B1 20070815; DE 10160262 A1 20030618; DE 50210690 D1 20070927; JP 2003193930 A 20030709; US 2003106947 A1 20030612; US 6896198 B2 20050524

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171206

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080516

2008-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071030

2007-09-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210690 P 20070927

2007-08-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-08-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060223

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031211

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI