Global Patent Index - EP 1318304 A2

EP 1318304 A2 2003-06-11 - Vane pump

Title (en)

Vane pump

Title (de)

Flügelzellenpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à palettes

Publication

EP 1318304 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026051 A

Priority

DE 10160286 A

Abstract (en)

The pump has an intake side, a housing with drive shaft and rotor, a rear blade oil channel, and working chambers with suction zones with intake chambers, and pressure zones with outlet chambers. A pressure medium flow coming from a first outlet chamber (13) is controlled by a shut-off valve (18), so that with low pump RPM, the flow is fed into a pressure collection chamber (15), and with higher pump RPM, is short-circuited resp. fed directly to the pump intake side (1), e.g. into the suction intake (2) via an injector (25). A piston (20) of the shut-off valve is controlled dependent upon pump RPM.

Abstract (de)

Eine Flügelzellenpumpe, zum Erzeugen eines Druckmittelstromes zu einem Verbraucher weist folgende Merkmale auf: eine Pumpensaugseite, die von einem Sauganschluß mit einem Druckmittel versorgbar ist und eine Pumpendruckseite, die mittels einer Hauptdruckleitung mit dem Verbraucher verbindbar ist; ein Pumpengehäuse in dem ein Kurvenring gehalten und eine Antriebswelle mit einem Rotor gelagert ist, wobei der Rotor Schlitze aufweist in denen Flügel verschiebbar geführt sind; einen Hinterflügelölkanal, der über Bohrungen und Nuten mit der Pumpendruckseite verbunden ist und die innenliegenden Stirnflächen der Flügel mit einem Betriebsdruck beaufschlagt; und Arbeitskammern, die je eine Saugzone mit einer Einlaßkammer und eine Druckzone mit einer Auslaßkammer aufweisen, wobei die Druckmittelströme aus den Arbeitskammern in einen Drucksammelraum führbar sind. Der Druckmittelstrom aus einer ersten Auslaßkammer (13) ist dabei mittels einem Abschaltventil (18) derart steuerbar, daß der Druckmittelstrom bei niedrigen Pumpendrehzahlen dem Drucksammelraum (15) und bei höheren Pumpendrehzahlen kurzschließbar bzw. direkt der Pumpensaugseite (1) zuführbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/344

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01C 21/08 (2006.01); F04C 2/344 (2006.01); F04C 14/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 14/02 (2013.01); F01C 21/0863 (2013.01); F04C 2/3446 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4136150 A1 19930506

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318304 A2 20030611; EP 1318304 A3 20030910; EP 1318304 B1 20090218; DE 10160286 A1 20030618; DE 50213284 D1 20090402

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50213284

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161116

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROBERT BOSCH AUTOMOTIVE STEERING GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ZF LENKSYSTEME GMBH, 73527 SCHWAEBISCH GMUEND, DE

- Document: DE 50213284

- Effective date: 20150423

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091122

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091122

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090518

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213284 P 20090402

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2009-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060329

2004-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2004-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040117

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-09-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI