Global Patent Index - EP 1318304 B1

EP 1318304 B1 2009-02-18 - Vane pump

Title (en)

Vane pump

Title (de)

Flügelzellenpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à palettes

Publication

EP 1318304 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 02026051 A

Priority

DE 10160286 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1318304A2] The pump has an intake side, a housing with drive shaft and rotor, a rear blade oil channel, and working chambers with suction zones with intake chambers, and pressure zones with outlet chambers. A pressure medium flow coming from a first outlet chamber (13) is controlled by a shut-off valve (18), so that with low pump RPM, the flow is fed into a pressure collection chamber (15), and with higher pump RPM, is short-circuited resp. fed directly to the pump intake side (1), e.g. into the suction intake (2) via an injector (25). A piston (20) of the shut-off valve is controlled dependent upon pump RPM.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/344 (2006.01); F01C 21/08 (2006.01); F04C 14/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 14/02 (2013.01); F01C 21/0863 (2013.01); F04C 2/3446 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318304 A2 20030611; EP 1318304 A3 20030910; EP 1318304 B1 20090218; DE 10160286 A1 20030618; DE 50213284 D1 20090402

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161116

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROBERT BOSCH AUTOMOTIVE STEERING GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ZF LENKSYSTEME GMBH, 73527 SCHWAEBISCH GMUEND, DE

- Document: DE 50213284

- Effective date: 20150423

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091122

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091122

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090518

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213284 P 20090402

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2009-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060329

2004-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2004-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040117

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-09-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI