Global Patent Index - EP 1318305 A2

EP 1318305 A2 2003-06-11 - Vane pump

Title (en)

Vane pump

Title (de)

Flügelzellenpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à palettes

Publication

EP 1318305 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026053 A

Priority

DE 10160200 A

Abstract (en)

The pump has a housing with cam ring and drive shaft with rotor, and a rear blade oil channel (14). The pressure from this channel charges a servo unit (15,16). The first servo unit next to the working chamber (10) of the cam ring (9) is charged with the pressure from the rear blade oil channel, and the opposite second servo unit is charged with the pressure from the pump pressure side (3). The second unit has a spring (18) acting against the pressure of the first servo unit. The main pressure line (4) leading to a consumer has a regulator flap (23), which corresponds with a bypass valve (25) to regulate a bypass conduit (24).

Abstract (de)

Eine Flügelzellenpumpe zum Erzeugen eines Druckmittelstromes zu einem Verbraucher, weist folgende Merkmale auf: eine Pumpensaugseite (1); ein Pumpengehäuse (5), in dem ein Kurvenring (9) eingesetzt und eine Antriebswelle mit einem Rotor gelagert ist, wobei der Rotor Schlitze (7) aufweist, in denen Flügel (8) verschiebbar geführt sind; zwei druckbeaufschlagte Stelleinrichtungen (15,16) zur Veränderung der Exzentrität des Kurvenrings; einen Hinterflügelölkanal (14), der über Bohrungen und Nuten mit der Pumpendruckseite (3) verbunden ist; und eine durch den Kurvenring (9) und den Rotor (6) gebildete Arbeitskammer (10), die in axialer Richtung durch Steuerplatten begrenzt ist, wobei die Arbeitskammer (10) eine Saugzone (11) und eine Druckzone (12) aufweist und durch die Flügel (8) unterteilte Förderkammern gebildet sind. Dabei ist die Stelleinrichtung mit dem Druck des Hinterflügelölkanals (14) beaufschlagt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/344; F04C 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/344 (2006.01); F04C 14/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 14/223 (2013.01); F04C 2/3442 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9919629 A1 19990422 - ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318305 A2 20030611; EP 1318305 A3 20030917; DE 10160200 A1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160601

2015-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROBERT BOSCH AUTOMOTIVE STEERING GMBH

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031220

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI