Global Patent Index - EP 1318306 A1

EP 1318306 A1 2003-06-11 - Device for dispensing a liquid

Title (en)

Device for dispensing a liquid

Title (de)

Abgabevorrichtung für ein Fluid

Title (fr)

Dispositif de distribution de liquid

Publication

EP 1318306 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02405937 A

Priority

  • EP 02405937 A
  • EP 01811180 A

Abstract (en)

A rotary pump (3) having a rotor (31) is arranged directly in the outlet (4) of the supply tank (2), for mixing the fluid (F) in the supply tank and discharging it to the pressure line (5) through its outlet (41). <??>An Independent claim is also included for usage method of dispensing apparatus.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Abgabevorrichtung für ein Fluid vorgeschlagen mit einem Vorratsbehälter (2) für das Fluid, der einen Ausgang (4) aufweist, welcher mit einer Druckleitung (5) für das Fluid (F) verbindbar ist, und mit einer Rotationspumpe (3), die einen Rotor (31) zum Fördern des Fluids (F) in die Druckleitung aufweist, wobei der Rotor (31) zur Durchmischung des Fluids unmittelbar im Ausgang (4) des Vorratsbehälters (2) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 13/16; B24B 57/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 37/04 (2012.01); B24B 57/02 (2006.01); F04D 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 37/04 (2013.01); B24B 57/02 (2013.01); F04D 13/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318306 A1 20030611; EP 1318306 B1 20050601

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061104

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061104

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-05-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060302

2005-11-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051104

2005-07-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50203258 P 20050707

2005-06-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SULZER MANAGEMENT AG PATENTABTEILUNG/0067

2005-06-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI

2005-06-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040116

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI