Global Patent Index - EP 1318308 A2

EP 1318308 A2 2003-06-11 - Vacuum pump

Title (en)

Vacuum pump

Title (de)

Vakuumpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à vide

Publication

EP 1318308 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02258145 A

Priority

JP 2001370627 A

Abstract (en)

A multiple cylinder (2) having a plurality of cylinders (4, 5) arranged concentrically and a rotor shaft (8) rotatably disposed on the center axis of the multiple cylinder are provided in a pump casing (1). Each of the cylinders that constitute the multiple cylinder has a mounting portion (10, 11), through which the cylinders are integrally fixed to the rotor shaft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 19/04; F04D 29/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 19/04 (2006.01); F04D 29/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 19/046 (2013.01); F04D 19/044 (2013.01); F04D 29/266 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318308 A2 20030611; EP 1318308 A3 20031203; CN 1429994 A 20030716; JP 2003172291 A 20030620; KR 20030045597 A 20030611; TW 200300819 A 20030616; US 2003103847 A1 20030605

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-09-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-08-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-12-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04D 19/04 A

2003-12-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04D 29/26 B

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI