Global Patent Index - EP 1318312 A2

EP 1318312 A2 2003-06-11 - Shaft sealing system for rotary shafts on pumps

Title (en)

Shaft sealing system for rotary shafts on pumps

Title (de)

Wellenabdichtungssystem für rotierende Wellen an Pumpen

Title (fr)

Système d'étanchéité pour l'arbre rotatif d'une pompe

Publication

EP 1318312 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027126 A

Priority

  • DE 10159938 A
  • DE 10254281 A

Abstract (en)

The shaft (1) has a rotor (3) fastened to it in the pump feed chamber (2), and a slide ring seal (5) in the shaft sealing chamber (4). A concentric cooling chamber (6) with coolant flowing through it, is located around the shaft between the chambers. The coolant is the medium conveyed by the pump, or a medium compatible with pump and conveyed medium. The pressure of the coolant in the cooling chamber is higher than that of the conveyed medium in the pump feed chamber.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Wellenabdichtungssystem für rotierende Wellen (1) an Pumpen mit einem im Pumpenförderraum (2) auf der Welle (1) befestigten Laufrad (3) und einer im Wellendichtungsraum (4) angeordneten Gleitringdichtung (5). Zur Verlängerung der Standzeit der Gleitringdichtung wird vorgeschlagen, dass sich zwischen dem Pumpenförderraum (2) und dem Wellendichtungsraum (4) ein um die Welle (1) konzentrisch angeordneter Kühlraum (6) befindet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/12; F04D 29/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/10 (2006.01); F04D 29/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/106 (2013.01); F04D 29/588 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318312 A2 20030611; EP 1318312 A3 20050622

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060913

2006-03-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR

2006-02-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051222

2005-06-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2005-06-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO