Global Patent Index - EP 1318351 A2

EP 1318351 A2 2003-06-11 - Solid fuel combustion device and method of supplying air to such a device

Title (en)

Solid fuel combustion device and method of supplying air to such a device

Title (de)

Feststoffverbrennungsanlage und Verfahren zum Zuführen von Luft zu einer solchen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de combustion à combustible solide et procédé d'alimentation en air d'un tel dispositif

Publication

EP 1318351 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026516 A

Priority

DE 10160415 A

Abstract (en)

The solid fuel burner has a revolving grate (1) with hollow carrier arms (4) to guide the air feed through them. A following after burner chamber (3) is after the revolving grate. The combustion air is divided into three part-streams (L1-L3), with 12-28% of the total air volume passing through the carrier arms and 20-40% of the total air volume entering the after burner chamber. An opening (9) in the housing (2) allows 35-65% of the total air volume through.

Abstract (de)

In einer Verbrennungsanlage für Festbrennstoff, bestehend aus einem mit hohlen, luftzuführenden Tragarmen (4) versehenen Drehrost (1), einem den Drehrost umgebenden Gehäuse (2) und einer dem Drehrost gegenüberstehenden Nachbrennkammer (3) wird die Verbrennungsluft in drei Teilströmen (L1,L2,L3) zugeführt, wobei den Tragarmen zwischen 12 und 28% der Gesamtluftmenge, der Nachbrennkammer zwischen 20 und 40% der Gesamtluftmenge und durch eine eigens dazu bestimmte Öffnung (9) in das Gehäuse zwischen (35) und 65% der Gesamtluftmenge zugeführt werden. Hierdurch wird erreicht, daß einerseits ein niedriger Sauerstoffüberschuß in den Abgasen und andererseits eine Materialtemperatur am Drehrost erreicht werden, die unter der Ascheschmelztemperatur des Brennstoffs liegt und den Drehrost gegen Materialüberhitzung schützt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23B 1/24; F23B 5/04; F23G 5/22; F23L 1/02; F23L 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23B 30/04 (2006.01); F23B 80/00 (2006.01); F23G 5/22 (2006.01); F23L 1/02 (2006.01); F23L 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23L 1/02 (2013.01); F23B 1/24 (2013.01); F23B 5/04 (2013.01); F23G 5/22 (2013.01); F23L 9/02 (2013.01); F23G 2202/103 (2013.01); F23G 2203/203 (2013.01); F23G 2209/261 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0952398 A2 19991027 - SCHOPPE TECHNOLOGIE GMBH DR [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318351 A2 20030611; EP 1318351 A3 20030910; EP 1318351 B1 20071114; DE 10160415 A1 20030618; DE 50211198 D1 20071227

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2014-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50211198

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SCHOPPE, FRITZ, DR.-ING.

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091126

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091203

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080815

2008-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-12-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50211198 P 20071227

2007-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR

2007-08-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23B 30/04 20060101AFI20070724BHEP

2007-08-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23B 80/00 20060101ALI20070724BHEP

2007-08-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23L 1/02 20060101ALI20070724BHEP

2007-08-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23L 9/02 20060101ALI20070724BHEP

2007-08-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23G 5/22 20060101ALI20070724BHEP

2004-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR

2004-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040310

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-09-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI