Global Patent Index - EP 1318352 A2

EP 1318352 A2 2003-06-11 - Arrangement for connecting two segments of a balanced flue duct

Title (en)

Arrangement for connecting two segments of a balanced flue duct

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Verbinden zweier Abschnitte einer Luft-Abgas-Leitung

Title (fr)

Arrangement pour connecter deux parties d'un conduit de cheminée avec amenée d'air de combustion

Publication

EP 1318352 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026202 A

Priority

DE 10159564 A

Abstract (en)

The connector comprises an inner curved fumes-discharge pipe (4) which has a rear extension of one (6) of its arms (5,6) in the form of a connecting piece closed by a removable cover (18). An outer curved, air-pipe (1) contains the inner curved pipe and has an opening (7) in a rear extension of both its arms (2,3). The opening is closed by a removable cap (8) and lies on a plane which slopes in relation to the axes of the two arms of the outer curved pipe.

Abstract (de)

Die Einrichtung weist einen der Abgasführung zugeordneten inneren Rohrbogen (4) auf, der in rückwärtiger Fortsetzung seines Arms (6) mit einem Stutzen (13) versehen ist. Der Stutzen bildet eine Injektionsöffnung und wird von einem abnehmbaren Deckel (18) verschlossen. Ferner ist ein der Luftführung zugeordneter äußerer Rohrbogen (1) vorgesehen, der den inneren Rohrbogen (4) aufnimmt. Er weist in rückwärtiger Fortsetzung seiner beiden Arme (2,3) eine Öffnung (7) auf, die von einer abnehmbaren Kappe (8) verschlossen ist. Die Öffnung liegt in einer Ebene, die geneigt zu den Achsen der beiden Arme (2,3) des äußeren Rohrbogens (1) sowie senkrecht zu derjenigen Ebene verläuft, die von den Achsen dieser beiden Arme aufgespannt wird. Die Öffnung (7) bietet die Möglichkeit, den inneren Rohrbogen (4) problemlos in den äu╬▓eren Rohrbogen (1) "hineinzudrehen", ohne daß große Abmaße des äußeren Rohrbogens erforderlich wären. Auch erleichtert die Öffnung (7) die Inspektion sowohl der Luftführung als auch der Abgasführung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23J 13/02; F23J 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23J 13/02 (2006.01); F23J 13/04 (2006.01); F23J 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23J 13/04 (2013.01); F23J 13/025 (2013.01); F23J 13/08 (2013.01); F23J 2211/101 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318352 A2 20030611; EP 1318352 A3 20031210; EP 1318352 B1 20060802; AT 335168 T 20060815; DE 10159564 C1 20030626; DE 50207706 D1 20060914

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161126

2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170601

2017-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161126

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-09-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-09-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161126

2017-08-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170731

2017-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161126

2017-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 335168 T

- Effective date: 20161126

2017-07-05 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50207706

2017-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-01-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2008-06-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061103

2007-07-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070503

2007-03-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070102

2006-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061023

2006-11-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061113

2006-11-02 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061102

2006-11-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061102

2006-11-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061102

2006-11-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: CENTROTHERM SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH

- Effective date: 20060823

2006-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207706 P 20060914

2006-09-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-08-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CENTROTHERM SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH

2006-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2006-08-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-02 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2006-08-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2006-08-02 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2006-08-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2006-08-02 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2004-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040108

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-12-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI