Global Patent Index - EP 1318357 A2

EP 1318357 A2 2003-06-11 - Flow rate controller

Title (en)

Flow rate controller

Title (de)

Strömungsmengenregler

Title (fr)

Régulateur de débit

Publication

EP 1318357 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026210 A

Priority

  • DE 10159635 A
  • DE 10204387 A

Abstract (en)

The housing (1) contains a flap (2) mounted on an angled axle (15) with one arm (50) parallel, in an open position, with the pipe's axis, in a backward flow direction; and the other arm (51), in a closed position, at right angles to the pipe's axis. Two parallel spring elements (21) are attached to a bar (28) penetrating the housing wall (5) and grip the lever arm (17) fixed to the flap. The bar has a scale on its casing (25) on the outer housing wall, with a transverse part (29) possessing a thread for a threaded pin (32) supported on a casing's base part (23,27). The bar is freely movable in and or with the transverse part.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Strömungsmengenregler für eine Luftleitung einer Klimaanlage ist in einem Gehäuse (1) eine Klappe (2) auf einer nahe der Querschnittsmittelachse angeordneten Achse (15) gelagert, die nahe der Achse (15) gewinkelt ist. Zwei an einer die Gehäusewand durchsetzenden Stange (28) gehalterte Federelemente (21;22) greifen an einem an der Klappe (2) befestigten Hebelarm an. Die Stangen (28) sind in einem außen auf der Gehäusewand angeordneten, eine Skala aufweisenden Mantel (25) mit einem Querteil (28) versehen, das ein Gewinde für einen Gewindestift (32) aufweist, der auf einem an der Gehäusewand befestigten Basisteil (23,27) des Mantels (25) abgestützt ist und so eine gewünschte, einer bestimmten einzuregelnden Strömungsmenge entsprechende Vorspannung des Federelements (21;41 ) einzustellen erlaubt. Dabei ist jedoch für das zweite Federelement (22) eine wahlfrei einzurichtende freie Verschiebbarkeit der Stange (28) in dem Querteil (29) und/oder mit dem Querteil (29) vorgesehen. Das zweite Federelement kann so auch inaktiv bleiben und bei Bedarf zusätzlich zu dem ersteren Federelement (21) oder statt dessen zur Einstellung einer größeren einzuregelnden Strömungsmenge dienen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 11/00; F24F 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/1426 (2013.01); F24F 2013/146 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

RO SI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318357 A2 20030611; EP 1318357 A3 20050608; EP 1318357 B1 20091021; AT 446486 T 20091115; DE 10204387 A1 20030612; DE 50213940 D1 20091203; DK 1318357 T3 20100125; ES 2334107 T3 20100305; PT 1318357 E 20091124; SI 1318357 T1 20100129

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171103

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171106

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171103

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-03 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-03-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50213940

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BERNHARDT/WOLFF PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2014-03-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50213940

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BERNHARDT/WOLFF PARTNERSCHAFT M, DE

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101126

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101127

2012-01-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120110

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101126

2011-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101126

2011-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101127

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091021

2011-08-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20110729

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101126

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101126

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110526

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101126

2011-07-11 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2011-06-28 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-06-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-06-02 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110526

2011-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SIEGWART, EMIL

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100122

2010-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100722

2010-08-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091021

2010-08-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091021

2010-07-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100121

2010-07-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091021

2010-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-03-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20091117

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-03-05 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2334107 T3

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20091120

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20091104

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091125

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20091102

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20091204

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20091119

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091204

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-12-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-12-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213940 P 20091203

2009-11-24 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20091117

2009-11-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT

2009-11-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-10-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2009-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: RO SI

2009-10-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-07-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEGWART, EMIL

2009-07-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SIEGWART, EMIL

2006-03-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2006-03-01 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20050916

- Countries: RO

2006-03-01 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20050916

- Countries: SI

2005-11-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-06-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-06-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-06-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24F 11/00 A

2005-06-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24F 13/14 B

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI