Global Patent Index - EP 1318358 A2

EP 1318358 A2 2003-06-11 - Flow rate controller

Title (en)

Flow rate controller

Title (de)

Strömungsmengenregler

Title (fr)

Régulateur de débit

Publication

EP 1318358 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026211 A

Priority

  • DE 20119695 U
  • DE 10204389 A

Abstract (en)

A housing contains a flap mounted on an angled axle, with one arm, in an open position, pointing backwards in a flow direction parallel with the pipe's axis. The other arm, in a closed position, is at right angles to the pipe's axis. A spring element (44) attached to a bar penetrating the housing wall grips a lever-arm fixed to the flap. The bar is adjustable outside the housing. The spring element consists of juxtaposed helical springs (42,43) with differing characteristics. The path of the helical spring with a flatter characteristic is restricted by a stop-piece (48). A tie rod (45) goes through the helical spring and coupling.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Strömungsmengenregler für eine Luftleitung einer Klimaanlage ist in einem Gehäuse eine Klappe auf einer nahe der Querschnittsmittelachse angeordneten Achse gelagert, die nahe der Achse gewinkelt ist. Die Klappe ist durch mindestens ein Federelement gegen die von der Strömung auf sie ausgeübte Kraft in einer den Strömungsquerschnitt mehr oder weniger verschließenden Stellung gehalten. Das Federelement (44) ist durch eine Mehrzahl aneinandergesetzter Schraubenfedern (42;43) von verschiedener Kennlinie gebildet. Die Schraubenfedern (42;43) sind mittels eines Kupplungsstücks zusammengesetzt, das ein den Windungen der Federn angepasstes Außengewinde aufweist und auf das die Enden der Schraubenfedern (42;43) aufgeschraubt sind. Die Schraubenfeder (42) mit flacherer Kennlinie und das Kupplungsstück können von einem Zuganker (45) durchsetzt sein, an dessen Ende ein Kopf (48) als ein Anschlag angeordnet ist, an dem das auf dem Zuganker (45) verschiebbare Kupplungsstück anstößt. Die Halterung des Federelements (44) an der Stange (28) umfasst ein Gelenkteil, vorzugsweise eine gelenkig an der Stange angebrachte Hülse, in die ein Kupplungsstück mit einem den Federwindungen angepassten Außengewinde eingeschraubt ist, auf das das Ende der Schraubenfeder (43) aufgeschraubt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 11/04; F24F 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/1426 (2013.01); F24F 2013/146 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318358 A2 20030611; EP 1318358 A3 20050608; EP 1318358 B1 20100317

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171103

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171106

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171103

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-28 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 50214286

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: F24F0011040000

- IPC: F24F0011740000

2017-11-03 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-03-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50214286

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BERNHARDT/WOLFF PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2014-03-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50214286

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BERNHARDT/WOLFF PARTNERSCHAFT M, DE

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101126

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101126

2012-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 461402 T

- Effective date: 20101126

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101126

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101126

2011-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SIEGWART, EMIL

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101220

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100317

2011-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100317

2011-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100719

2010-11-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100617

2010-11-30 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100317

2010-11-30 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100317

2010-10-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100317

2010-10-29 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100317

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100628

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100618

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100317

2010-10-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100317

2010-10-27 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2010-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100317

2010-07-14 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20100317

2010-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT

2010-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50214286 P 20100429

2010-04-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2010-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2010-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: RO SI

2010-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071113

2006-03-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2006-03-01 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20050916

- Countries: RO

2006-03-01 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20050916

- Countries: SI

2005-11-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-06-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-06-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-06-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24F 11/04 A

2005-06-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24F 13/14 B

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI