Global Patent Index - EP 1318360 A2

EP 1318360 A2 2003-06-11 - Ventilation outlet

Title (en)

Ventilation outlet

Title (de)

Quellauslass

Title (fr)

Sortie d'air

Publication

EP 1318360 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027388 A

Priority

  • DE 10160464 A
  • DE 10161145 A

Abstract (en)

At least part of the outer casing (1.1) has cavities (2) and an inner conical casing (4,10) which has preferably rectangular windows (5) or openings (13). The width of some windows can be altered. The first three windows (5.1); the next four windows (5.2) and three more windows (5.3) are the same width. Between each two windows is an area (6.1-6.9) with increasing width upwards. At least part of the inner casing has a movable cover part of which has openings (8) in.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Quellauslass zum Einbringen von kalter und/oder warmer Zuluft in einen Raum mit einem Aussenmantel (1.1, 1.2, 1.3), welcher zumindest teilweise mit Ausnehmungen (2, 34) versehen ist und einen Innenmantel (4, 10, 36) zumindest teilweise umfasst, welcher zumindest teilweise Fenster (5) oder Öffnungen (13, 37) aufweist, soll eine Weite (a1 bis a3) von zumindest einigen Fenstern (5) des Innenmantels (4) veränderbar sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/068

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/068 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/068 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318360 A2 20030611; EP 1318360 A3 20050817

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110701

2008-04-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080328

2006-05-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2006-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051224

2005-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2005-08-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO