Global Patent Index - EP 1318365 A1

EP 1318365 A1 2003-06-11 - Method of controlling a variable cooling capacity compressor and refrigerator or freezer controlled by such method

Title (en)

Method of controlling a variable cooling capacity compressor and refrigerator or freezer controlled by such method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Regelung eines Kompressors mit variabler Kühlleistung und nach diesem Verfahren geregelter Kühl- oder Gefrierschrank

Title (fr)

Procédé de réglage d'un compresseur à capacité de refroidissement variable et réfrigérateur ou congélateur contrôlé par ce procédé

Publication

EP 1318365 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01128455 A

Priority

EP 01128455 A

Abstract (en)

A method for controlling the cooling capacity of a variable cooling capacity (VCC) compressor of a refrigerator or freezer (R) comprises an electronic controller (C) which receives a temperature feedback signal from the refrigerator/ freezer cell. The output signal of the electronic controller is based on a predetermined on/off band which is different from the on/off temperature band and which is preferably a on/off speed band. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 49/02; G05B 1/01; G05B 11/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 49/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 49/022 (2013.01); F25B 2400/073 (2013.01); F25B 2600/0251 (2013.01); F25D 2700/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318365 A1 20030611; EP 1318365 B1 20070704; DE 60129231 D1 20070816; DE 60129231 T2 20080313; ES 2290083 T3 20080216

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171129

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171113

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171129

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161206

2017-08-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161111

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151211

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-06-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080407

2008-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2290083 T3

2007-11-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60129231 P 20070816

2007-08-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2007-07-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI