Global Patent Index - EP 1318371 A2

EP 1318371 A2 2003-06-11 - Use of a surface for heat transfer, more especially for fluid evaporation and condensation process

Title (en)

Use of a surface for heat transfer, more especially for fluid evaporation and condensation process

Title (de)

Verwendung einer Fläche zur Wärmeübertragung, insbesondere für Verdampfungs- und Kondensationsprozesse von Fluiden

Title (fr)

Utilisation d'une surface pour un transfert de chaleur, en particulier pour des procédés d'évaporation et de condensation de fluides

Publication

EP 1318371 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027031 A

Priority

DE 10159860 A

Abstract (en)

The heat transfer surface (3), on a plate or tube body (4), has a galvanized projecting micro-structure extending from the base surface (3a) with a minimum height of 10 mu m. The base surface is covered with projections (6), wholly or partially, as pin-shaped micro-structures. The longitudinal axes (6c) of the micro-pins are either at right angles to the surface or they are pitched at an angle of 30-90 degrees to the surface. The micro-pins have a thickness (d) of 0.2-100.0 mu m, with a pin density of 10<2>-10<8> per cm<2>. The structures are galvanized on to the surface using a polymer membrane with micro-pores.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Wärmeübertragungsfläche (3) auf rohr- oder plattenförmigen Körpern (4) mit einer aus der Grundfläche (3a) herausragenden Mikrostruktur (7) von Vorsprüngen (6), die mit einer Mindesthöhe von 10 µm auf die Grundfläche (3a) galvanisiert sind. Der Erfindung liegt die Aufgabe zugrunde, eine Wärmeübertragungsfläche (3) dieser Art zu schaffen, die sich bei möglichst niedrigen Temperaturdifferenzen mit einem optimalen thermischen Wirkungsgrad durch eine Erhöhung der thermischen Leistung ihrer wärmeübertragenden Flächen (3) auszeichnet und sich mit einem vertretbaren Herstellungsaufwand sowohl für eine Blasenverdampfung als auch für die Filmkondensation eignet. Diese Aufgabe wird erfindungsgemäß dadurch gelöst, daß die Grundfläche (3a) ganz oder teilweise mit Vorsprüngen (6) bedeckt ist, daß diese Vorsprünge (6) in Form von geordneten Mikrostrukturen (7) aufgebracht sind und eine Stiftform aufweisen, die sich mit ihrer Längsachse (6c) entweder senkrecht oder unter einem Winkel (α) zwischen 30° und 90° zur Grundfläche (3a) erstreckt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 13/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 5/02 (2006.01); C25D 7/00 (2006.01); F28F 1/12 (2006.01); F28F 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 13/187 (2013.01); C25D 5/022 (2013.01); C25D 7/00 (2013.01); F28F 1/124 (2013.01); Y10S 165/905 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318371 A2 20030611; EP 1318371 A3 20050713; EP 1318371 B1 20080116; AT 384237 T 20080215; DE 10159860 A1 20030724; DE 10159860 C2 20031204; DE 50211546 D1 20080306; ES 2300414 T3 20080616; PT 1318371 E 20080422; US 2003136547 A1 20030724; US 6736204 B2 20040518

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ERK ECKROHRKESSEL GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MICRYON TECHNIK GMBH, 06484 QUEDLINBURG, DE

- Document: DE 50211546

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-11-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50211546

- Representative's name: SCHULZ JUNGHANS PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

- Effective date: 20131016

2014-11-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50211546

- Representative's name: SCHULZ JUNGHANS PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

- Effective date: 20121114

2013-10-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50211546

2013-10-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50211546

- Representative's name: SCHULZ JUNGHANS PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111204

2013-07-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130704

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111203

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120701

2013-01-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111203

2013-01-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20101203

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 384237 T

- Effective date: 20111203

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111203

2012-11-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50211546

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHULZ JUNGHANS, DE

2012-11-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50211546

2012-11-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50211546

- Representative's name: SCHULZ JUNGHANS PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111203

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111204

2012-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120604

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111203

2012-07-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-07-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111203

2012-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-07-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120701

2012-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MICRYON TECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-06-14 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20120604

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110330

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110121

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110121

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-07-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20110401

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110128

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110323

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-05-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20110323

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110224

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110325

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110401

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080417

2009-04-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080116

2008-12-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081017

2008-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080116

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080116

2008-10-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080116

2008-10-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2008-09-30 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080116

2008-09-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-08-29 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080416

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080116

2008-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2300414 T3

2008-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2008-05-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080422

2008-05-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-04-22 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20080411

2008-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50211546 P 20080306

2008-02-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2008-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE SI SK TR

2008-01-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-11-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE SI SK TR

2007-07-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF A SURFACE FOR HEAT TRANSFER, MORE ESPECIALLY FOR FLUID EVAPORATION AND CONDENSATION PROCESS

2006-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MICRYON TECHNIK GMBH

2006-04-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2006-01-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2005-07-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO