Global Patent Index - EP 1318373 A1

EP 1318373 A1 2003-06-11 - Multifucfional receiving ring mount for the turret of armoured vehicles

Title (en)

Multifucfional receiving ring mount for the turret of armoured vehicles

Title (de)

Multifunktionaler Aufnahmering für den Turm gepanzerter Fahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Anneau de positionnement pour la tourelle de véhicules blindés

Publication

EP 1318373 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02021929 A

Priority

DE 10160215 A

Abstract (en)

The multi-function mounting ring (6) for a secondary weapon, at the roof (1) or turret of a wheeled or tracked armored vehicle, is an adapter and an interface built into the circular opening (6a) in the roof or turret and welded in place. The weapon mounting (3) is fitted to the ring and secured by bolts (7) to give a choice of weapons. The weapon mounting has a bearing ring (5), which fits the vehicle mounting ring. A hatch can be fitted to the mounting ring instead of a weapon.

Abstract (de)

Für ein gepanzertes Fahrzeug wird ein multifunktionaler Aufnahmering für eine Fahrzeugöffnung im Dachbereich vorgeschlagen, der als Schnittstelle und Flanschring den wechselweisen Einbau einer Luke oder einer zusätzlichen Bewaffnung oder einer anderen Funktionsbaugruppe zuläßt und eine schnelle und einfache Anpassung eines Fahrzeugs an eine Mission erlaubt und wobei auch die Anzahl der Fahrzeugtypen einer Fahrzeugfamilie klein gehalten werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 23/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 23/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 23/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318373 A1 20030611; DE 10160215 A1 20030626; DE 20221903 U1 20090312; NO 20024928 A 20030610; NO 20024928 D0 20021014; NO 333589 B1 20130715

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081113

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050816

2005-11-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI