Global Patent Index - EP 1318433 A2

EP 1318433 A2 2003-06-11 - Use of polyolefinic waxes in electrophotographic toners

Title (en)

Use of polyolefinic waxes in electrophotographic toners

Title (de)

Verwendung von polar modifizierten Polyolefinwachsen in elektrophotographischen Tonern

Title (fr)

Utilisation de cires à base de polyoléfines pour des révélateurs électrophotographiques

Publication

EP 1318433 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026226 A

Priority

DE 10159955 A

Abstract (en)

Polar modified polyolefin waxes (I), produced using metallocene catalysts, are used in phototoners. <??>An Independent claim is also included for phototoners containing pigment component(s), resin component(s) and (I).

Abstract (de)

Verwendung von polar modifizierten Polyolefinwachsen in Fototonern. Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft die Verwendung von mittels Metallocenkatalysatoren hergestellten polar modifizierten Polyolefinwachsen in Fototonern sowie Fototoner, die derartige polar modifizierte Polyolefinwachse enthalten.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 9/087

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 9/08 (2006.01); C08F 8/06 (2006.01); C08F 8/46 (2006.01); C08F 255/00 (2006.01); G03G 9/087 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 9/08708 (2013.01); G03G 9/08704 (2013.01); G03G 9/08722 (2013.01); G03G 9/08782 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318433 A2 20030611; EP 1318433 A3 20040331; CN 1423174 A 20030611; DE 10159955 A1 20030626; JP 2003215835 A 20030730; US 2003108807 A1 20030612; US 7005224 B2 20060228

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-03 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060309

2006-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

2004-12-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI