Global Patent Index - EP 1318437 A1

EP 1318437 A1 2003-06-11 - Watch with transponder that is, at least partially, located in a control member

Title (en)

Watch with transponder that is, at least partially, located in a control member

Title (de)

Uhr mit Transponder, der wenigstens teilweise in einem Bedienungselement eingebaut ist

Title (fr)

Montre comportant un transpondeur au moins partiellement logé dans un organe de commande

Publication

EP 1318437 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01204721 A

Priority

EP 01204721 A

Abstract (en)

The watch includes an adjuster (8) and unit (15) for reception and transmission of radio signals. This unit is mounted in the aperture (14) which also accommodates the adjuster shaft. The adjuster aperture (14) may be lined with a non-conducting material. <??>The watch (1) includes a casing (2) within which the watch movement (10) is accommodated. The hands (5,6,7) are mounted above the movement in the space enclosed by the watch glass (3). The adjuster aperture (14) may be lined with a non-conducting material offering a suitable environment for the radio unit.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une pièce d'horlogerie (1) comportant notamment une carrure (2) dans laquelle sont disposés un mouvement horloger (10), des moyens d'affichage de l'heure (5, 6, 7), la pièce d'horlogerie (1) comportant en outre un organe de commande (8, 9) du mouvement et un dispositif (15) de réception et/ou d'émission de signaux radio-diffusés. Il est prévu de limiter l'encombrement du dispositif (15) dans la pièce d'horlogerie (1), en le disposant au moins partiellement dans un logement (14) prévu à l'intérieur de l'organe de commande (8, 9). Cet agencement est particulièrement favorable dans le cas où la carrure (2) est métallique, en prévoyant dans cette dernière une partie non conductrice au niveau de l'ouverture (11) de passage de l'organe de commande (8, 9). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04G 1/00; H01Q 1/27

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04G 21/04 (2013.01); H01Q 1/27 (2006.01); H01Q 1/44 (2006.01); H01Q 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04G 21/04 (2013.01); G04R 60/12 (2013.01); H01Q 1/273 (2013.01); H01Q 1/44 (2013.01); H01Q 7/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318437 A1 20030611

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091029

2009-07-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G04G 1/06 20060101AFI20090527BHEP

2009-07-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01Q 1/27 20060101ALI20090527BHEP

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2004-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031211

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI