Global Patent Index - EP 1318485 A1

EP 1318485 A1 2003-06-11 - Method and system of security-filtering users of a public transport network

Title (en)

Method and system of security-filtering users of a public transport network

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zur sicherheitsspezifischen Auswahl von Benutzern eines öffentlichen Verkehrsnetzes

Title (fr)

Procédé et système de filtrage de sûreté d'usagers d'un réseau de transport en commun

Publication

EP 1318485 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290461 A

Priority

  • EP 02290461 A
  • EP 01403143 A

Abstract (en)

Security method for filtering passengers using public transport (R3) in which prior to travel passengers enroll (10, 100) thus forming a collection of agreed passengers (90) with all undesirables rejected (75). Travelers are rejected by use of security databases. At the time of travel verification (250) of agreed passengers takes place. Validation or identification can be by biometric means, e.g. digital fingerprinting, etc. <??>An Independent claim is made for a passenger filtering system to improve passenger security comprising networks for enrolling passengers and checking their identity.

Abstract (fr)

Selon le procédé, il est prévu une étape préparatoire au transport, d'enrôlement (10, 100) d'usagers, pour former un ensemble d'usagers agréés (90), expurgé des personnes à refouler (75), et une étape initiale de transport, de vérification (250) des usagers agréés. Le système de filtrage de sûreté comporte un réseau (R1) de moyens (10, 100) d'enrôlement de personnes, des moyens informatiques (60, 80, 90) de stockage des identités d'usagers agréés, auxquels sont reliés les moyens d'enrôlement de personnes, et au moins un réseau (R6, R7) de moyens (250) de vérification des usagers agréés, reliés auxdits moyens informatiques de stockage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/00 (2006.01); G06Q 50/00 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01); H04L 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00087 (2013.01); G07C 9/00103 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318485 A1 20030611; AU 2002364316 A1 20030617; CA 2469446 A1 20030612; EP 1456818 A1 20040915; JP 2005516275 A 20050602; US 2005120227 A1 20050602; WO 03049043 A1 20030612

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-22 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAGEM DEFENSE SECURITE

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031211

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI