Global Patent Index - EP 1318524 A2

EP 1318524 A2 2003-06-11 - X-ray optical system and method for imaging a source

Title (en)

X-ray optical system and method for imaging a source

Title (de)

Röntgen-optisches System und Verfahren zur Abbildung einer Quelle

Title (fr)

Système optique à rayons X et méthode pour former un image d'une source

Publication

EP 1318524 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026625 A

Priority

DE 10160472 A

Abstract (en)

The system has two x-ray reflectors (A,B) for focussing an x-ray source (S) onto a target region. The x-ray reflectors are tilted towards each other, with an offset from 90 degrees so that the combined acceptance region of the x-ray reflectors is matched to the shape of the x-ray source and/or the target region. The offset from 90 degrees is preferably between 30 and 85 degrees. The x-ray reflectors may comprise a multilayer structure. <??>Independent claims are also included for the following: <??>(1) an x-ray diffractometer; and <??>(2) a method of focusing an image source for x-ray or neutron radiation onto a target region.

Abstract (de)

Ein Röntgen-optisches System mit zwei Röntgen-Spiegeln (A, B) zum Abbilden einer Röntgen-Quelle (S) auf einen Zielbereich, ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass die Röntgen-Spiegel (A, B) abweichend von 90° derart gegeneinander verkippt angeordnet sind, dass der kombinierte Akzeptanzbereich der Röntgen-Spiegel (A, B) an die Form der Röntgen-Quelle (S) und/oder des Zielbereichs angepasst ist. Dadurch wird mit geringen und technischen einfachen Modifikationen problemlos eine Erhöhung der Intensität der fokussierten Röntgen-Strahlung auf der Probe bei gleichbleibender Emissionsleistung der Röntgen-Quelle (S) ermöglicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21K 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21K 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21K 1/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318524 A2 20030611; EP 1318524 A3 20070704; EP 1318524 B1 20090318; DE 10160472 A1 20030626; DE 10160472 B4 20040603; US 2003108153 A1 20030612; US 6925147 B2 20050802

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-02-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091221

2009-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB NL

2009-03-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-01-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-12-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): FR GB NL

2008-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080305

2008-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2008-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071219

2007-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2007-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI