Global Patent Index - EP 1318525 A2

EP 1318525 A2 2003-06-11 - Radiation image storage panel

Title (en)

Radiation image storage panel

Title (de)

Schirm zum Speichern eines Strahlungsbildes

Title (fr)

Ecran pour l'enregistrement d'une image obtenue par rayonnement

Publication

EP 1318525 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02102540 A

Priority

  • EP 02102540 A
  • EP 01000711 A

Abstract (en)

In accordance with the present invention a radiation image storage panel comprises a self-supporting or supported layer of storage phosphor particles dispersed in a binding medium and, adjacent thereto, a protective coating characterized in that, besides a binder, the said protective coating comprises a white pigment having a refractive index of more than 1.6, which is present in the said binder, preferably further comprising a urethane acrylate, and wherein said protective coating has a surface roughness (Rz) between 2 and 10 µm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21K 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21K 4/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21K 4/00 (2013.01); G21K 2004/06 (2013.01); G21K 2004/08 (2013.01); G21K 2004/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318525 A2 20030611; EP 1318525 A3 20070328

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-04-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA HEALTHCARE NV

2008-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080219

2007-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070928

2007-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA HEALTHCARE NV

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2007-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-09-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VAN DEN BERGH, RUDI.AGFA-GEVAERT CORP.IP DEP.3800

2003-09-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CABES, THOMAS.AGFA-GEVAERT CORP.IP DEP.3800

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI