Global Patent Index - EP 1318529 A2

EP 1318529 A2 2003-06-11 - Surface hardened soft magnetic actuator part and fabrication process

Title (en)

Surface hardened soft magnetic actuator part and fabrication process

Title (de)

Oberflächengehärtetes weichmagnetisches Aktuatorteil und dessen Herstellverfahren

Title (fr)

Actuateur magnétique magnétiquement doux durci en surface et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1318529 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027301 A

Priority

DE 10160550 A

Abstract (en)

Soft magnetic actuator part has a surface hardness of at least 150 HV 0.01 increased by nitriding. The N concentration has the following deep profile: a top value of maximum N concentration of at least 0.2 wt.% in the depth region of up to 1 mu m, an N-concentration of at least 0.25 wt.% in the depth region of 1 mu m, an N-concentration of at least 0.1 wt.% in the depth region of 2 mu m and an N-concentration of at least 0.05 wt.% in the depth region of 5 mu m. <??>An Independent claim is also included for a process for the surface treatment of an electromagnetic actuator part comprising nitriding at 380-480 degrees C at a nitriding number KN of approximately 10, preferably in an oxygen atmosphere (oxynitriding) at an oxidation number KO of approximately 0.20.

Abstract (de)

Weichmagnetisches Aktuatorteil mit durch Nitrieren gesteigerter Oberflächenhärte von mindestens 150 HV0,01, gekennzeichnet durch folgendes Tiefenprofil der N-Konzentration: im Tiefenbereich bis 1 µm einen Spitzenwert der maximalen N-Konzentration von mindestens 0,2%, bei einer Tiefe von 1 µm eine N-Konzentration von mindestens 0,25% und bei einer Tiefe von 2 µm eine N-Konzentration von mindestens 0,1%. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 7/06; H01H 71/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/24 (2006.01); H01F 3/08 (2006.01); H01H 71/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/24 (2013.01); H01F 3/08 (2013.01); H01H 71/327 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1318529 A2 20030611; EP 1318529 A3 20040114

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090701

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031209

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01F 7/06 A

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01H 71/32 B

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI